This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2021 at 21:13:59 (UTC).

Henry's Bullfrog Bees et al v. Sunland Trading, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Henry's Bullfrog Bees filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Sunland Trading, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley and Carolyn K. Delaney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00582

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Henry's Bullfrog Bees

Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC

Kelvin Adee Doing business as Adee Honey Farms

Defendants

Intertek Testing Services, NA, Inc.

Barkman Honey, LLC

Sunland Trading, Inc.

Dutch Gold Honey, Inc.

NSF International

Lamex Foods, Inc.

True Source Honey, LLC

Odem International Inc.

American Analytical Chemistry Laboratories Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gillian Leigh Wade

Attorney at Milstein Jackson Fairchild & Wade, LLP

10990 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Sara Dawn Avila

Attorney at Milstein Jackson Fairchild & Wade, LLP

10990 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Trevor M. Flynn

Attorney at Fitzgerald Joseph LLP

2341 Jefferson Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92110

Melanie R. Persinger

Attorney at Fitzgerald Joseph LLP

2341 Jefferson Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92110

John Joseph Fitzgerald, IV

Attorney at Fitzgerald Joseph LLP

2341 Jefferson Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92110

Paul K. Joseph

Attorney at Fitzgerald Joseph LLP

2341 Jefferson St., Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92110

Michael Robert Reese

Attorney at Michael Reese

100 West 93Rd Street, Ste 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10025

George Volney Granade, II

Attorney at Reese LLP

8484 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 515

Los Angeles, CA 90211

Defendant Attorneys

Catherine Susan Simonsen

Attorney at White & Case LLP

555 S. Flower Street, Suite 2700

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2433

Bryan A. Merryman

Attorney at White & Case LLP

555 S. Flower St., Suite 2700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nathaniel Lampley, Jr., PHV

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

301 E. 4Th Street, Suite 3500

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Kenneth J. Rubin, PHV

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

52 East Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Jeffrey A. Miller, PHV

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

301 E. 4Th Street, Suite 3500

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Thomas N. McCormick

Attorney at Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP

4675 Macarthur Court, Suite 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Robert Laurence Rosenthal

Attorney at Howard & Howard Attorneys

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 1000

Las Vegas, CA 89169

Robert D. Swanson

Attorney at Boutin Jones Inc.

555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1500

Sacramento, CA 95814

Jessica Nelson, PHV

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP

100 South Fifth St, Suite 2500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Donald Heeman, PHV

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP

100 South Fifth St, Suite 2500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Randi Winter, PHV

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP

100 South Fifth St, Suite 2500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Ryan A. Ellis

Attorney at Ryan Ellis Law

3268 Governor Dr., Suite 140

San Diego, CA 92122

16 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#79

(#79) OPPOSITION by Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC to #72 Motion to Dismiss. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#78

(#78) OPPOSITION by Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC to #71 Motion to Dismiss. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#77

(#77) OPPOSITION by Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC to #70 Motion to Dismiss. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#76

(#76) OPPOSITION by Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC to #68 Motion to Dismiss. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#75

(#75) OPPOSITION by Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC to #64 Motion to Dismiss. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#72

(#72) MOTION to DISMISS by True Source Honey, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Aveni, David) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#71

(#71) MOTION to DISMISS by Lamex Foods, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Grasu, Vickie) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#70

(#70) MOTION to DISMISS by Odem International Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Caseria, Leo) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#68

(#76) OPPOSITION by Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC to #68 Motion to Dismiss. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

VDRP

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) OPPOSITION by Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC to #72 Motion to Dismiss. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) OPPOSITION by Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC to #71 Motion to Dismiss. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) OPPOSITION by Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC to #70 Motion to Dismiss. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) OPPOSITION by Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC to #68 Motion to Dismiss. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) OPPOSITION by Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC to #64 Motion to Dismiss. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) OPPOSITION by Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC to #67 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gillian L. Wade, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Wade, Gillian) Modified on 10/1/2021 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Barkman Honey, LLC. (Poulos, John) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) MOTION to DISMISS by True Source Honey, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Aveni, David) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) MOTION to DISMISS by Lamex Foods, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Grasu, Vickie) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) MOTION to DISMISS by Odem International Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Caseria, Leo) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Thomas N. McCormick on behalf of Dutch Gold Honey, Inc.. Attorney McCormick, Thomas N. added. (McCormick, Thomas) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/3/2021: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. #8 ) and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Defendant Intertek Testing Services, NA, Inc. ONLY is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (Text Only Entry) (Krueger, M) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of Defendant Intertek Testing Services, NA, Inc. only Without Prejudice (Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)) by All Plaintiffs. (Wade, Gillian) Modified on 5/20/2021 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by John Joseph Fitzgerald, IV. (Fitzgerald, John) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Robert Reese on behalf of Henry's Bullfrog Bees. Attorney Reese, Michael Robert added. (Reese, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by John Joseph Fitzgerald, IV on behalf of Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC. Attorney Fitzgerald, John Joseph added. (Fitzgerald, John) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sara Dawn Avila on behalf of Kelvin Adee, Henry's Bullfrog Bees, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC. Attorney Avila, Sara Dawn added. (Avila, Sara) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Barkman Honey, LLC, Dutch Gold Honey, Inc., Intertek Testing Services, NA, Inc., Lamex Foods, Inc., NSF International, Sunland Trading, Inc., True Source Honey, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gillian Leigh Wade* *Milstein Jackson Fairchild & Wade, LLP* *10250 Constellation Blvd., Floor 14* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Kelvin Adee, Save Golden Prairie Honey Farms, LLC, Henry's Bullfrog Bees. Attorney Wade, Gillian Leigh added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9508317) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lamex Foods, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NSF International is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERTEK TESTING SERVICES NA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BARKMAN HONEY,LLC is a litigant