This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:38:29 (UTC).

Henry v. USA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Henry filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg Kays and Prisoner Pro Se. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00985

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

Referral Judge

Prisoner Pro Se

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Andre M Henry

Texarkana, TX 75505

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Laine T Cardarella

Federal Public Defender'S Office - Kcmo Walnut Street, 1000 Walnut, Ste. 600

Kansas City, MO 64106

FPD

Attorney at Federal Public Defender

818 Grand Boulevard, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64106

Dawn M Parsons

Attorney at Shaffer Lombardo Shurin

2001 Wyandotte Street

Kansas City, MO 64108

Respondent Attorney

Alison Dawn Dunning

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office-KCMO

400 E 9Th Street, Suite 5510

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Dawn M Parsons on behalf of Andre M Henry. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Parsons, Dawn) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Laine T Cardarella on behalf of Andre M Henry. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Laine T Cardarella added to party Andre M Henry(pty:mov))(Cardarella, Laine) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of appearance by Alison Dawn Dunning on behalf of USA (Attorney Alison Dawn Dunning added to party USA(pty:res))(Dunning, Alison) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL UNDER CJA replacing the Federal Public Defender in post-conviction proceedings under 28 USC 2241, 2254 or 2255. Dawn M Parsons for Andre M Henry. ORDERED that counsel is appointed for the limited purposes set forth in the Rehaif v. United States Standing Order (attached hereto). If your client wishes to assert claims unrelated to Rehaif v. United States, he/she should file a pro se supplemental motion. MOTION to withdraw is granted. Signed on 12/16/2019 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (Martin, Jan) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

5 #1

Standing Order

#1

(#1) MOTION to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) Andre M Henry. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Jones, Robin) (Document was mailed to the US Attorney's Office and forwarded to the Clerk's Office on 12/6/2019.) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER pursuant to Rehaif v. United States appointing FPD for Andre M Henry. This appointment is limited to cases affected or potentially affected by Rehaif v. United States. Signed on July 24, 2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Jones, Robin) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#9) ORDER that Respondent shall answer Petitioner's claims and show cause on or before February 3, 2020, why the relief Petitioner seeks should not be granted. Signed on 1/3/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Doty, Greg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Dawn M Parsons is terminated. Signed on 1/2/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Dawn M Parsons on behalf of Andre M Henry. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Parsons, Dawn) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#6) ORDER. Plaintiff's counsel shall file an amended motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 by 1/31/2020. Signed on 1/2/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL UNDER CJA replacing the Federal Public Defender in post-conviction proceedings under 28 USC 2241, 2254 or 2255. Dawn M Parsons for Andre M Henry. ORDERED that counsel is appointed for the limited purposes set forth in the Rehaif v. United States Standing Order (attached hereto). If your client wishes to assert claims unrelated to Rehaif v. United States, he/she should file a pro se supplemental motion. MOTION to withdraw is granted. Signed on 12/16/2019 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (Martin, Jan) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of appearance by Alison Dawn Dunning on behalf of USA (Attorney Alison Dawn Dunning added to party USA(pty:res))(Dunning, Alison) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Laine T Cardarella on behalf of Andre M Henry. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Laine T Cardarella added to party Andre M Henry(pty:mov))(Cardarella, Laine) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER pursuant to Rehaif v. United States appointing FPD for Andre M Henry. This appointment is limited to cases affected or potentially affected by Rehaif v. United States. Signed on July 24, 2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Jones, Robin) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) Andre M Henry. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Jones, Robin) (Document was mailed to the US Attorney's Office and forwarded to the Clerk's Office on 12/6/2019.) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.