This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 08:47:11 (UTC).

Henry Reynolds v. Andrew Saul

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Henry Reynolds filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Andrew Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06337

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henry Reynolds

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sima G Aghai

Attorney at Sima Aghai Law Offices

7827 Westminster Boulevard

Westminster, CA 92683

Defendant Attorneys

Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel for Social Security Adm.

Assistant US Attorney LA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Armand D Roth

Attorney at SAUSA - Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (iva) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Henry Reynolds, upon Plaintiff Andrew Saul served on 8/12/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Civil Clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aghai, Sima) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Armand D Roth added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Roth, Armand) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (iva) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Andrew Saul. (esa) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Henry Reynolds, (Aghai, Sima) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Henry Reynolds. (Aghai, Sima) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Henry Reynolds. (Aghai, Sima) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27236252 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Henry Reynolds. (Attorney Sima G Aghai added to party Henry Reynolds(pty:pla))(Aghai, Sima) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less