Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2019 at 07:32:46 (UTC).

Henriquez v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2019 Henriquez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia G. Cooke and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-22963

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ricardo Henriquez

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production Inc.

BP America Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig Thomas Downs

Attorney at The "Downs Law Group"

3250 Mary Street Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Nathan Lee Nelson

Attorney at The Downs Law Group

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Charles David Durkee

Attorney at The Downs Law Group

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Defendant Attorneys

Don Keller Haycraft

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139

Georgia Lee Lucier

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP (Houston)

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Catherine Pyune McEldowney

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kevin Michael Hodges

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005

Schuyler Analise Smith

Attorney at Hamilton, Miller & Birthisel LLP

150 Se 2 Avenue, Suite #1200

Miami, FL 33131

Jerry Dean Hamilton

Attorney at Hamilton Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Southeast Second Avenue, Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33131-2332

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/05/2019)

23 #2

Exhibit Consent to Magistrate

23 #1

Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order

#23

(#23) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by BP America Production Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit Consent to Magistrate)(Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#22

(#22) Certificate of Other Affiliates by Ricardo Henriquez (Nelson, Nathan) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

20 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#20

(#20) STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Charles David Durkee for Craigh T. Downs by Ricardo Henriquez. Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Ricardo Henriquez(pty:pla). Responses due by 8/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Unopposed STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Jerry D. Hamilton and Schuyler A. Smith for Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine P. McElDowney, Don K. Haycraft by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc.. Attorney Schuyler Analise Smith added to party BP Exploration & Production Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than May 30, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/2/2019.(mmv) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-Election Not to Mediate

#1

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by BP America Production Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit Consent to Magistrate)(Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Certificate of Other Affiliates by Ricardo Henriquez (Nelson, Nathan) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. Attorney Craig Thomas Downs terminated is hereby withdrawn and substituted by David Durkee as counsel of record for the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/7/2019. (jzn) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Charles David Durkee for Craigh T. Downs by Ricardo Henriquez. Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Ricardo Henriquez(pty:pla). Responses due by 8/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, and Don Keller Haycraft are withdrawn as counsel for Defendants and are substituted by Jerry D. Hamilton and Schuyler A. Smith of the law firm Hamilton Miller & Birthisel LLP, as counsel of record for the BP Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/29/2019. (jzn) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BP P. L. C. for BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Other Affiliate BP P. L. C. for BP America Production Company (Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Unopposed STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Jerry D. Hamilton and Schuyler A. Smith for Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine P. McElDowney, Don K. Haycraft by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc.. Attorney Schuyler Analise Smith added to party BP Exploration & Production Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Schuyler Analise Smith on behalf of BP America Production Company. Attorney Schuyler Analise Smith added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft). (Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Don Keller Haycraft, mailing date July 18, 2019, (cco) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#9) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00213. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb). (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred to Southern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/16/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than May 30, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/2/2019.(mmv) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7355185) filed by Ricardo Henriquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Nathan Lee Nelson added to party Ricardo Henriquez(pty:pla).(Nelson, Nathan) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles David Durkee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Thomas Downs