This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2022 at 10:50:26 (UTC).

Henny v. Matevousian et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 Henny filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Matevousian. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy E. Brasel and Leo I. Brisbois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-02122

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy E. Brasel

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Ann Henny

Waseca, MN 56093

Defendants

Andre Matevousian

Dr. Reyna

T. Peterson

P.A. Taylor

Deann Hiller

Warden Mistell Starr

Ms. Omelson

T. Vaught

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Envelope

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit(s)

#3

(#3) ORDER - 1. Plaintiff Kimberly Ann Henny must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $109.83 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order; and 2. If Plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee in the time permitted, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/16/2022.(JLB) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. As soon as practicable and in any event by no later than thirty (30) days from the date of the present Order, Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $109.83; and If Plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee in the time permitted, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/13/2022. (JLB) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit(s)

6 #2

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for reconsideration of the determination of funds necessary for filing fees re #5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed by Kimberly Ann Henny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(ACH) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. As soon as practicable and in any event by no later than thirty (30) days from the date of the present Order, Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $109.83; and If Plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee in the time permitted, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/13/2022. (JLB) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Kimberly Ann Henny. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 10/26/2022 (JME). (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER - 1. Plaintiff Kimberly Ann Henny must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $109.83 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order; and 2. If Plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee in the time permitted, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/16/2022.(JLB) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Prisoner Complaint. The document was regenerated as it was missing an exhibit. The exhibit was scanned and attached. (JME) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Kimberly Ann Henny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(JGK) Document QC'd on 9/8/2022 (JME). (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Deann Hiller, Andre Matevousian, Omelson, T. Peterson, Reyna, Mistell Starr, P.A. Taylor, T. Vaught filed by Kimberly Ann Henny. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 9/8/2022 (JME). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2022: #3 Exhibit. Missing exhibit scanned and attached) (JME). (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less