This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2021 at 08:58:21 (UTC).

HENNINGER v. AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 HENNINGER filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-12280

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHANIE HENNINGER

Defendant

AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC A. SHORE

20 Brace Roadsuite 325

Cherry Hill, NJ 08034

YVETTE CHARLENE CAVE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC A. SHORE

4 Echelon Plaza201 Laurel Road, 8Th Floor

Voorhees, NJ 08043

Defendant Attorney

LAURA MARY LESTRADE

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY

250 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10177

 

Court Documents

#8

7 #1

Certificate of Service Sub of Attorney - DCS

#7

#6

5 #4

Text of Proposed Order

5 #3

Exhibit 2

5 #2

Exhibit 1

5 #1

Affidavit of Melissa Raphan

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Rule 7.1 Statement

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Declaration of Kelsey Ahern

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketText Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/27/2021. Formal discovery is stayed. The parties may exchange discovery necessary to facilitate settlement. The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 8/31/2021, with a joint written status update. (mm) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - -The #8 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan submitted by Dennis Schmieder on 7/8/2021 must be executed by a Judicial Officer before filing. Please forward to the appropriate Judicial Officer in accordance with the instructions outlined in the #4 Order Scheduling Conference. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mg) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Discovery Plan by STEPHANIE HENNINGER.(SCHMIEDER, DENNIS) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney YVETTE CHARLENE CAVE terminated. Attorney DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER for STEPHANIE HENNINGER added.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Sub of Attorney - DCS)(SCHMIEDER, DENNIS) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Melissa Raphan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/2/2021. (mg) Modified on 7/20/2021 (eaj, ). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Raphan. Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Raphan by AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Melissa Raphan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(LESTRADE, LAURA) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2021 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/15/2021. (jem) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC.(LESTRADE, LAURA) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC identifying AMPF Holding LLC as Corporate Parent.. (LESTRADE, LAURA) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice Of Removal filed by AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC on 6/8/2021 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (jal, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC from New jersey Superior Court, case number LCV20211100098. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12530897), filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Kelsey Ahern, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Rule 7.1 Statement, #5 Certificate of Service)(LESTRADE, LAURA) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant