This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2021 at 15:50:39 (UTC).

Hennessey v. Kohls Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Hennessey filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Kohls Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David D. Noce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01866

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David D. Noce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jill Hennessey

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendants

Kohls Corporation

2110 Highway K

O'Fallon, MO 63366

Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.

2110 Highway K

O'Fallon, MO 63366

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher O. Bauman

Attorney at BLITZ AND BARDGETT - Clayton

120 S. Central Ave., Suite 1500

Clayton, MO 63105

Matthew J. Zevin

Attorney at STANLEY LAW GROUP - San Diego

10021 Willow Creek Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92131

Robert D. Blitz

Attorney at BLITZ AND BARDGETT - Clayton

120 S. Central Ave., Suite 1500

Clayton, MO 63105

Scott Kitner

Attorney at STANLEY LAW GROUP - Dallas

6116 N. Central Expwy, Ste 1500

Dallas, TX 75206

Jason Turk

Attorney at BLITZ AND BARDGETT - Clayton

120 S. Central Ave., Suite 1500

Clayton, MO 63105

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie Sheridan

Attorney at STEPTOE AND JOHNSON LLP - San Francisco

1 Market Street, Spear Tower, 39Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Anthony Anscombe

Attorney at STEPTOE AND JOHNSON LLP - Chicago

227 West Monroe St., Ste 4700

Chicago, IL 60606

Jamie Marie Noonan Witte

Attorney at STEPTOE AND JOHNSON LLP - Chicago

227 West Monroe St., Ste 4700

Chicago, IL 60606

Benjamin Daniel Woodard

Attorney at STINSON LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63105

John R. Munich

Attorney at STINSON LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63105

Darlene Alt

Attorney at STEPTOE AND JOHNSON LLP - Chicago

227 West Monroe St., Ste 4700

Chicago, IL 60606

Joy Syrcle

Attorney at STINSON LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63105

Meegan Brooks

Attorney at STEPTOE AND JOHNSON LLP - San Francisco

1 Market Street, Spear Tower, 39Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Surya Kundu

Attorney at STEPTOE AND JOHNSON LLP - San Francisco

1 Market Street, Spear Tower, 39Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

154 #1

Exhibit A

#154

(#154) MOTION for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Munich, John) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#153

(#153) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #148 MOTION for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and In Support of Defendants' Motion to Deny Class Certification and to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations filed by Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. (Munich, John) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

152 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

152 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

152 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#151

(#151) MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Kohl's Motion for Leave of Court to Submit Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey. (Bauman, Christopher) (At counsel's request - Main Document 151 replaced on 8/5/2021) (KJS). Modified on 8/5/2021 (KJS). (Entered: 08/05/2021)

148 #1

Exhibit A - D

#148

(#148) MOTION for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and In Support of Defendants' Motion to Deny Class Certification and to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations by Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Munich, John) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

7 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

5 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#5

(#6) Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. ( Response to Court due by 9/4/2019.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/2/19. (KKS) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by John R. Munich for Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. (Munich, John) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey Process Server: Lousika Legal Courier, LLC (BAK) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

1 #3

Original Filing Form

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#6) Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. ( Response to Court due by 9/4/2019.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/2/19. (KKS) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

318 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) MOTION for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Munich, John) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #148 MOTION for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and In Support of Defendants' Motion to Deny Class Certification and to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations filed by Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. (Munich, John) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey re #151 MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Kohl's Motion for Leave of Court to Submit Supplemental Authority . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Bauman, Christopher) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Kohl's Motion for Leave of Court to Submit Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey. (Bauman, Christopher) (At counsel's request - Main Document 151 replaced on 8/5/2021) (KJS). Modified on 8/5/2021 (KJS). (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey. (Bauman, Christopher) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Kohl's Motion for Leave of Court to Submit Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Scott Kitner, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Bauman, Christopher) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) MOTION for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and In Support of Defendants' Motion to Deny Class Certification and to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations by Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Munich, John) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey. (Bauman, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for 142 (STATUS CONFERENCE) by Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc. for proceedings held on 6/7/2021 court reporter Reagan Fiorino before Judge David D. Noce.. (Alt, Darlene) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket***REMARK as to Jill Hennessey. Sent a copy of the Transcript Order Request for 142 to the Court Reporter this day. (JMP) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew J. Zevin. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number BMOEDC-7413240) by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zevin, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • SECOND Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Jill Hennessey to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. ( Response to Court due by 9/4/2019.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/2/19. (KKS) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Jill Hennessey to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Munich, John) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by John R. Munich for Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. (Munich, John) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • (#3) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Christopher O. Bauman. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey Process Server: Lousika Legal Courier, LLC (BAK) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7309236, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jill Hennessey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bauman, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2019: #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Summons) (BAK). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES INC. DBA DBA: A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA KOHL'S INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA KOHL'S SEAL BEACH STORE 10604 DBA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS A PUBLIC ENTITY UNDER LAWS OF AND IN T is a litigant

Latest cases where Kohls Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darlene Kay Alt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Daniel Woodard