This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2021 at 07:12:05 (UTC).

HENNEDY v. NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 HENNEDY filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01039

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEAN HENNEDY

Defendant

NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT H. GRAFF

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC A. SHORE, P.C.

1500 Jfk Blvd, Suite 1240

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

DANA B. HASNESS

Attorney at MARGOLIS EDELSTEIN

170 S. Independence Mall W, Suite 400E

Philadelphia, PA 19106

MICHAEL RONALD MILLER

Attorney at MARGOLIS EDELSTEIN

170 S. Independence Mall W, Suite 400 E

Philadelphia, PA 19106-3337

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) STIPULATION TO STAY THIS MATTER FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES ONLY by NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC. (HASNESS, DANA) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEAN HENNEDY. NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL RONALD MILLER on behalf of NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC (MILLER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DANA B. HASNESS on behalf of NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC (HASNESS, DANA) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14958567.), filed by DEAN HENNEDY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION TO STAY THIS MATTER FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES ONLY by NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC. (HASNESS, DANA) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEAN HENNEDY. NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL RONALD MILLER on behalf of NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC (MILLER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DANA B. HASNESS on behalf of NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC (HASNESS, DANA) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/4/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by DEAN HENNEDY. (lisad, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14958567.), filed by DEAN HENNEDY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW AGE DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL RONALD MILLER