This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 11:20:51 (UTC).

Hendrix v. The City of Atlanta, Georgia et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2019 Hendrix filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The City of Atlanta, Georgia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01773

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Hendrix

Defendants

Marian Woods

The City of Atlanta, Georgia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charlotte J. Redo

Debra E. Schwartz

Defendant Attorneys

Winfield Ward Murray, Jr.

Torrey D. Smith

Marlon Maurice Bull

Winfield Ward dept ofMurray, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 20 through October 9, 2019, by Debra E. Schwartz. (Schwartz, Debra) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #4 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 11/16/2019. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 07/09/2019. (usw) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#4

(#4) Joint JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Linda Hendrix. (Redo, Charlotte) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Instructions to Parties and Counsel, signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 06/12/2019. (usw) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The City of Atlanta, Georgia, Marian Woods. Discovery ends on 9/16/2019.(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/25/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Marian Woods, The City of Atlanta, Georgia. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8605373) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 20 through October 9, 2019, by Debra E. Schwartz. (Schwartz, Debra) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #4 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 11/16/2019. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 07/09/2019. (usw) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Joint JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Linda Hendrix. (Redo, Charlotte) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Instructions to Parties and Counsel, signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 06/12/2019. (usw) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The City of Atlanta, Georgia, Marian Woods. Discovery ends on 9/16/2019.(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Marian Woods, The City of Atlanta, Georgia. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8605373) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less