This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 10:29:00 (UTC).

Hendrix v. Columbia County Jail et al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Hendrix filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Columbia County Jail. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karin J. Immergut. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00006

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karin J. Immergut

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Lee Hendrix

St. Helens, OR 97051

Defendants

Wellpath Medical

Columbia County Jail

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Aryn M. Seiler

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

888 Sw Fifth Avenue, Suite 900

Portland, OR 97204-2025

Eric J. Neiman

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

888 Sw Fifth Avenue, Suite 900

Portland, OR 97204-2025

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Brandon Lee Hendrix. (joha) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This Court DISMISSES Hendrix's Complaint #2 ,without prejudice. Hendrix may file an amended complaint within thirty days of the date of this Order. This Court DENIES Hendrix's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #8 because he has demonstrated a sufficient ability to articulate his claims pro se in light of the complexity of the legal issues involved and, at this stage of the proceeding, he has not demonstrated a likelihood of success on the merits. Signed on 1/31/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 2/3/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: The Court GRANTS Hendrix's Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #7 . The Court ORDERS the Columbia County Jail to collect payments from Hendrix's trust account and forward the funds to the Clerk of the Court. Signed on 1/31/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party and Columbia County Sheriff's Office on 2/3/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#9

(#9) Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel #8 . Filed by Brandon Lee Hendrix. (sb) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#8

(#8) Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Brandon Lee Hendrix. (sb) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#7

(#7) Amended Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brandon Lee Hendrix. (dsg) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance of Aryn M. Seiler appearing on behalf of Wellpath Medical and Sharon Brown Filed by on behalf of Wellpath Medical. (Seiler, Aryn) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance of Eric J. Neiman appearing on behalf of Wellpath Medical and Sharon Brown Filed by on behalf of Wellpath Medical. (Neiman, Eric) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: This Court denies the application #1 . Plaintiff may file an amended application curing this deficiency within thirty days of the date of this Order. The amended application must bear the case number 3 :20- cv-00006-IM. Signed on 1/8/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed order and IFP application to Pro Se party on 1/9/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/3/20.) (dsg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#2

(#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Brandon Lee Hendrix against Columbia County Jail, Wellpath Medical. (dsg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#1

(#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brandon Lee Hendrix. (dsg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Brandon Lee Hendrix regarding Order #10 and Order #11 . (joha) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Brandon Lee Hendrix. (joha) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This Court DISMISSES Hendrix's Complaint #2 ,without prejudice. Hendrix may file an amended complaint within thirty days of the date of this Order. This Court DENIES Hendrix's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #8 because he has demonstrated a sufficient ability to articulate his claims pro se in light of the complexity of the legal issues involved and, at this stage of the proceeding, he has not demonstrated a likelihood of success on the merits. Signed on 1/31/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 2/3/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: The Court GRANTS Hendrix's Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #7 . The Court ORDERS the Columbia County Jail to collect payments from Hendrix's trust account and forward the funds to the Clerk of the Court. Signed on 1/31/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party and Columbia County Sheriff's Office on 2/3/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel #8 . Filed by Brandon Lee Hendrix. (sb) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Brandon Lee Hendrix. (sb) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Amended Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brandon Lee Hendrix. (dsg) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance of Aryn M. Seiler appearing on behalf of Wellpath Medical and Sharon Brown Filed by on behalf of Wellpath Medical. (Seiler, Aryn) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance of Eric J. Neiman appearing on behalf of Wellpath Medical and Sharon Brown Filed by on behalf of Wellpath Medical. (Neiman, Eric) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: This Court denies the application #1 . Plaintiff may file an amended application curing this deficiency within thirty days of the date of this Order. The amended application must bear the case number 3 :20- cv-00006-IM. Signed on 1/8/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed order and IFP application to Pro Se party on 1/9/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/3/20.) (dsg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Brandon Lee Hendrix against Columbia County Jail, Wellpath Medical. (dsg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brandon Lee Hendrix. (dsg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.