This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2020 at 07:57:22 (UTC).

Hendrickson v. Navigant Credit Union

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Hendrickson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Navigant Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond, John J. McConnell, Jr. and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00021

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judges

John J. McConnell, Jr.

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marissa M Hendrickson

Defendant

Navigant Credit Union

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren A. Solar

Attorney at Hackett Feinberg, PC

155 Federal Street, 9Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Daniel Tropin

Attorney at Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weiselberg Gilbert

1 W. Las Olas Blvd., Suite 500

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

Steven E. Snow

Attorney at Partridge, Snow & Hahn LLP

40 Westminster Street, Suite 1100

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Enlarging Time to Respond filed by Navigant Credit Union. (Snow, Steven) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Snow on behalf of Navigant Credit Union (Snow, Steven) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marissa M Hendrickson. Navigant Credit Union served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Navigant Credit Union. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Request filed by Marissa M Hendrickson. (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Daniel Tropin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1467454 ) filed by Marissa M Hendrickson. (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL entered: Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to District Judge William E. Smith for all further proceedings- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/16/2020. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#3

(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Marissa M Hendrickson. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1465154 ), filed by Marissa M Hendrickson.(Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Enlarging Time to Respond filed by Navigant Credit Union. (Snow, Steven) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Snow on behalf of Navigant Credit Union (Snow, Steven) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marissa M Hendrickson. Navigant Credit Union served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Navigant Credit Union. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Request filed by Marissa M Hendrickson. (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Tropin. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/23/2020. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Daniel Tropin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1467454 ) filed by Marissa M Hendrickson. (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL entered: Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to District Judge William E. Smith for all further proceedings- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/16/2020. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Marissa M Hendrickson. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1465154 ), filed by Marissa M Hendrickson.(Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Marissa M Hendrickson. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1465154 ), filed by Marissa M Hendrickson.(Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less