This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/23/2019 at 07:35:24 (UTC).

Henderson v. Parker et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Henderson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Parker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerome T. Kearney and Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00441

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerome T. Kearney

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Contrell Henderson

Benton, AR 72015

Defendants

Toya Parker

Teague

Aaron

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Plaintiff to submit the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application, with the required calculation sheet signed by authorized official of the prison, within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Saline County Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/29/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contrell Henderson. (llg) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing Plaintiff to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application, with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official of the prison, within 30 days of the entry of this Order; directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Saline Count Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/26/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Contrell Henderson.(kdr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contrell Henderson. (kdr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Plaintiff to submit the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application, with the required calculation sheet signed by authorized official of the prison, within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Saline County Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/29/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contrell Henderson. (llg) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing Plaintiff to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application, with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official of the prison, within 30 days of the entry of this Order; directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Saline Count Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/26/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Contrell Henderson.(kdr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contrell Henderson. (kdr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teague is a litigant

Latest cases where AARON'S is a litigant