Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2020 at 08:43:58 (UTC).

Henderson v. Comenity Bank, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 Henderson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Comenity Bank, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elayna J. Youchah and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00459

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larren Henderson

Defendants

Comenity Bank, LLC

Avant, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union LLC

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven A Alpert

Attorney at Price Law Group, APC

5940 S. Rainbow Blvd., Suite 3014

Las Vegas, NV 89118

Susan Rotkis

Attorney at Price Law Group

382 S. Convent Avenue

Tucson, AZ 85716

Defendant Attorneys

Ramir Mitchell Hernandez

Attorney at WRIGHT FINLAY & ZAK, LLP

7785 W. Sahara Ave, Ste 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

R. Samuel Ehlers

Attorney at Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP

7785 W. Sahara Ave., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Andrew J Sharples

1050 Indigo Dr., Ste. 200

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Jennifer Rebecca Bergh

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.

2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Trevor Waite

Attorney at ALVERSON TAYLOR & SANDERS

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Katherine A. Neben

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

Jeremy J. Thompson

Attorney at Clark Hill PLLC

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Jennifer L Braster

Attorney at Naylor & Braster

1050 Indigo Drive, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89145

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Sharples, Andrew) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#32

(#32) ORDER granting #31 STIPULATION for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to File a First Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#31

(#31) STIPULATION and Order for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to File Its First Amended Answer by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sharples, Andrew) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#30

(#30) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#29

(#29) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

28 #3

Declaration of Susan M. Rotkis

28 #2

Declaration of Larren Henderson

#28

(#28) MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendant Comenity Bank, LLC and Incorporated Memorandum re #27 Clerk's Entry of Default by Plaintiff Larren Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Larren Henderson, #3 Declaration of Susan M. Rotkis) (Rotkis, Susan) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#27

(#27) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Comenity Bank, LLC re #26 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (DRS) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Larren Henderson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Alpert, Steven) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#25) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Trans Union LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Sharples, Andrew) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting #31 STIPULATION for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to File a First Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STIPULATION and Order for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to File Its First Amended Answer by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sharples, Andrew) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendant Comenity Bank, LLC and Incorporated Memorandum re #27 Clerk's Entry of Default by Plaintiff Larren Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Larren Henderson, #3 Declaration of Susan M. Rotkis) (Rotkis, Susan) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Comenity Bank, LLC re #26 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (DRS) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant Comenity Bank, LLC by Plaintiff Larren Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit - Filed Summons Returned Executed) (Rotkis, Susan) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Trans Union LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #23 Second STIPULATION For Defendant, Equifax Information Solutions to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 4/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First STIPULATION and Order Extending Time for Equifax to file Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larren Henderson re #1 Complaint,,. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 3/10/2020. (Alpert, Steven) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larren Henderson re #1 Complaint,,. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/11/2020. (Alpert, Steven) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larren Henderson re #1 Complaint,,. Avant, LLC served on 3/12/2020. (Alpert, Steven) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larren Henderson. Comenity Bank, LLC served on 3/10/2020. (Alpert, Steven) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larren Henderson. Trans Union LLC served on 3/10/2020. (Alpert, Steven) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JM) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Larren Henderson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Alpert, Steven) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Avant, LLC, Comenity Bank, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5915340) by Larren Henderson. Proof of service due by 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Alpert, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVANT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Comenity Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant