This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2019 at 07:29:31 (UTC).

Henderson v. Brasuell et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 Henderson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Brasuell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00491

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Contrell Henderson

Benton, AR 72015

Defendants

Mike Robinson

J Brent Standridge

Toney Brasuell

Jonathan Camp

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#2

(#2) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS that you must pay the $400 filing fee or file an IFP motion within 30 days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send Mr. Henderson an IFP application. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/15/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER denying without prejudice #3 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing Henderson to either pay the $400 filing and administrative fee or file a complete IFP application within 30 days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send Henderson an IFP application. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/31/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#6

(#6) JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #5 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/3/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contrell Henderson. (llg) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Contrell Henderson.(kdr) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER dismissing without prejudice Henderson's claims; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/3/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #5 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/3/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER dismissing without prejudice Henderson's claims; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/3/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER denying without prejudice #3 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing Henderson to either pay the $400 filing and administrative fee or file a complete IFP application within 30 days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send Henderson an IFP application. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/31/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contrell Henderson. (llg) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS that you must pay the $400 filing fee or file an IFP motion within 30 days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send Mr. Henderson an IFP application. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/15/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Contrell Henderson.(kdr) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.