This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2019 at 06:08:14 (UTC).

Henderson v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 Henderson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristi K. DuBose, P. Bradley Murray and William E. Cassady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00449

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Judges

Kristi K. DuBose

P. Bradley Murray

William E. Cassady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martino Ladale Henderson

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production Inc

BP America Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Nations

Attorney at The Nations Law Firm

3131 Briarpark Dr., Suite 208

Houston, TX 77042

 

Court Documents

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

8 #3

Authorization

8 #2

HIPAA Protective Order

8 #1

Protective Order

#8

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-02126. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/4/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2019.] (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2019.] (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2019.] (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2019.] (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7463376) filed by Martino Ladale Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Martino Ladale Henderson(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2019.] (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Nations - PHV