This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2022 at 11:34:34 (UTC).

Henderson Implement & Marine L L C v. X L Specialty Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 Henderson Implement Marine L L C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against X L Specialty Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03774

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henderson Implement & Marine L L C

Defendant

X L Specialty Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tristan Gregory Gruspier

Peter Newton Freiberg

John Mark Fezio

Matthew Martin Mize

Rajan Pandit

W Brett Cain

Defendant Attorneys

Virginia Y Dodd

Jeffrey Scott Knighton, Jr

Kevin William Welsh

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Cade Richard Cole

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Enkey, R) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to X L Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Enkey, R) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 8/29/2022. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henderson Implement & Marine L L C. X L Specialty Insurance Co served on 9/1/2022, answer due 9/22/2022. (aty,Mize, Matthew) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by X L Specialty Insurance Co.(Attorney Jeffrey Scott Knighton, Jr added to party X L Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Knighton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Answer to Complaint, sent to Jeffrey Scott Knighton, Jr on behalf of X L Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/6/2022. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by X L Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent X L Specialty Insurance Co, Other Affiliate X L America Inc, Other Affiliate X L Group Ltd, Other Affiliate X L Reinsurance of America Inc, Other Affiliate AXA sa, Other Affiliate AXA XL Group for X L Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Knighton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, with consent sought but not yet obtained by Henderson Implement & Marine L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Fezio, John) Modified to reflect deficiency on 10/12/2022 (Thomas, T). Modified on 10/14/2022 to remove deficiency, see #12 Corrective document (Miletello, A). (Entered: 10/09/2022)

10 #1

Proposed pleading

10 #2

Proposed order

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Deficiency to John Mark Fezio on behalf of Henderson Implement & Marine L L C regarding #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, with consent sought but not yet obtained . Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion. Please refer to LR7.4.1, 7.6, or 7.9 for specific instructions regarding statements of consent. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#12

(#12) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Corrected Motion for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Complaint for Damages filed by Henderson Implement & Marine L L C regarding #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, with consent sought but not yet obtained . (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Fezio, John) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/13/2022. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Corrected Motion for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Complaint for Damages filed by Henderson Implement & Marine L L C regarding #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, with consent sought but not yet obtained . (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Fezio, John) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Deficiency to John Mark Fezio on behalf of Henderson Implement & Marine L L C regarding #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, with consent sought but not yet obtained . Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion. Please refer to LR7.4.1, 7.6, or 7.9 for specific instructions regarding statements of consent. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, with consent sought but not yet obtained by Henderson Implement & Marine L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Fezio, John) Modified to reflect deficiency on 10/12/2022 (Thomas, T). Modified on 10/14/2022 to remove deficiency, see #12 Corrective document (Miletello, A). (Entered: 10/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by X L Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent X L Specialty Insurance Co, Other Affiliate X L America Inc, Other Affiliate X L Group Ltd, Other Affiliate X L Reinsurance of America Inc, Other Affiliate AXA sa, Other Affiliate AXA XL Group for X L Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Knighton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Answer to Complaint, sent to Jeffrey Scott Knighton, Jr on behalf of X L Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/6/2022. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by X L Specialty Insurance Co.(Attorney Jeffrey Scott Knighton, Jr added to party X L Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Knighton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henderson Implement & Marine L L C. X L Specialty Insurance Co served on 9/1/2022, answer due 9/22/2022. (aty,Mize, Matthew) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge Terry A Doughty. Judge James D Cain, Jr no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 8/30/2022. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 8/29/2022. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to X L Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Enkey, R) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Enkey, R) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Enkey, R) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5235512) filed by HENDERSON IMPLEMENT AND MARINE, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Peter Newton Freiberg added to party HENDERSON IMPLEMENT AND MARINE, L.L.C.(pty:pla))(aty,Freiberg, Peter) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less