This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2022 at 09:48:35 (UTC).

Henard v. Shradder

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 Henard filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Shradder. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03123

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bobby E. Henard

Golden, CO 80402-6700

Defendants

Well Path Medical Services

Monica L. Alberts

Jamie Xiong

G. Gittens

Dr. Williams

Baughman

Cheurry

Knox

Cervantes

Gonsalves

DeCarlo

Clifton

Polly Abernathy

Mann

Barron

Darr

Jackson

Jamie Edwards

Respondent

Jeff Shradder

4 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Continuation of Main Document

#3

(#3) ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers which Mr. Henard files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/26/2021. (evana, ) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION regarding mail delays by Petitioner Bobby E. Henard. (evana, ) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Request Immediate TRO Preliminary Injunction Demand Jury Trial against Jeff Shradder, well path, Monica L. Alberts, Jamie Xiong, G. Gittens, Williams, Baughman, Cheurry, Knox, Cervantes, Gonsalves, DeCarlo, Clifton, Polly Abernathy, Mann, Barron, Darr, Jackson, Jamie Edwards, Cathy, M. Lavina, Nicole, Christina, Jane and John Does, filed by Bobby E. Henard.(evana, ) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#5

(#5) Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Petitioner Bobby E. Henard. (evana, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Immediate Preliminary Injunction (TRO) by Petitioner Bobby E. Henard. (evana, ) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #5 ) is GRANTED, that the Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to Business Office, Attn: Inmate Accounts, at the Jefferson County Detention Facility in Golden, Colorado. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/5/2021.(Mailed as ordered)(evana, ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #5 ) is GRANTED, that the Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to Business Office, Attn: Inmate Accounts, at the Jefferson County Detention Facility in Golden, Colorado. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/5/2021.(Mailed as ordered)(evana, ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Immediate Preliminary Injunction (TRO) by Petitioner Bobby E. Henard. (evana, ) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Petitioner Bobby E. Henard. (evana, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Request Immediate TRO Preliminary Injunction Demand Jury Trial against Jeff Shradder, well path, Monica L. Alberts, Jamie Xiong, G. Gittens, Williams, Baughman, Cheurry, Knox, Cervantes, Gonsalves, DeCarlo, Clifton, Polly Abernathy, Mann, Barron, Darr, Jackson, Jamie Edwards, Cathy, M. Lavina, Nicole, Christina, Jane and John Does, filed by Bobby E. Henard.(evana, ) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION regarding mail delays by Petitioner Bobby E. Henard. (evana, ) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers which Mr. Henard files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/26/2021. (evana, ) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Bobby E. Henard. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document)(jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Well Path Medical is a litigant

Latest cases where Baughman is a litigant

Latest cases where CLIFTON is a litigant

Latest cases where Knox Co Sheriff's Department is a litigant