This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2021 at 10:52:19 (UTC).

Henard v. Lavina et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 Henard filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lavina. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02032

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bobby E. Henard

Golden, CO 80402-6700

Defendants

Lavina

Valentine

Clifton

Quinn

L. Sayers

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Defendants names and Addresses with Declaration re #8 Second Order to cure deficiencies, by Plaintiff Bobby E. Henard (evana, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#9

(#9) Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Bobby E. Henard. (evana, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#8

(#8) SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/23/2021. (evana, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to #4 Order, Motion to Cure Deficiencies by Plaintiff Bobby E. Henard. (evana, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

6 #2

Declaration

6 #1

Exhibit

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE Identifying Defendants and addresses by Plaintiff Bobby E. Henard (evana, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/29/2021. (evana, ) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Immediate Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Bobby E. Henard. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT against Clifton, Lavina, Quinn, L. Sayers, Valentine, filed by Bobby E. Henard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Defendants names and Addresses with Declaration re #8 Second Order to cure deficiencies, by Plaintiff Bobby E. Henard (evana, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Bobby E. Henard. (evana, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/23/2021. (evana, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to #4 Order, Motion to Cure Deficiencies by Plaintiff Bobby E. Henard. (evana, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Bobby E. Henard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration)(evana, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Identifying Defendants and addresses by Plaintiff Bobby E. Henard (evana, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/29/2021. (evana, ) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Immediate Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Bobby E. Henard. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT against Clifton, Lavina, Quinn, L. Sayers, Valentine, filed by Bobby E. Henard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLIFTON is a litigant

Latest cases where VALENTINE LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINN COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP., is a litigant