This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 09:06:25 (UTC).

Hempstract, Inc. v. Haynes et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Hempstract, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Haynes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis L. Sammartino and Mitchell D. Dembin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01171

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janis L. Sammartino

Referral Judge

Mitchell D. Dembin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hempstract, Inc.

Defendants

Gregory Haynes

Kim Melbye

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen M. Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorneys

Paul Stephen Kirklin

Attorney at The Kirklin Law Firm, P.C.

12600 North Featherwood Drive, Suite 225

Houston, TX 77034

Robert A. Bonito

8 Bristol Court

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER Granting #15 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time and Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Complaint and/or Motion to Transfer Venue. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion (ECF No. #15 ) and ACCEPTS the MTD (ECF No. #12 ). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/11/2021. (tcf) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

15 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities Memo

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Kim Melbye, Gregory Haynes re #9 Notice of Party With Financial Interest filed by Gregory Haynes, Kim Melbye, #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Motion to Transfer filed by Gregory Haynes, Kim Melbye . (Bonito, Robert) (tcf). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Gregory Haynes, Kim Melbye (Kirklin, Paul) (tcf). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

12 #4

Declaration Exhibit C

12 #3

Declaration Exhibit B

12 #2

Declaration Exhibit A

12 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities Memo

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Paul Stephen Kirklin, re #6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/9/2021.(rmc) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

10 #4

Declaration Exhibit C

10 #3

Declaration Exhibit B

10 #2

Declaration Exhibit A

10 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities Memo

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) ***Document withdrawn per ECF #14 *** NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Gregory Haynes, Kim Melbye (Bonito, Robert) QC mailer sent re: attorney's signature does not match account used to file document (tcf). Modified to withdraw on 8/11/2021 (tcf). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16010833.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kirklin, Paul) (rmc). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Granting #15 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time and Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Complaint and/or Motion to Transfer Venue. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion (ECF No. #15 ) and ACCEPTS the MTD (ECF No. #12 ). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/11/2021. (tcf) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Gregory Haynes, Kim Melbye. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo)(Kirklin, Paul) (tcf). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Kim Melbye, Gregory Haynes re #9 Notice of Party With Financial Interest filed by Gregory Haynes, Kim Melbye, #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Motion to Transfer filed by Gregory Haynes, Kim Melbye . (Bonito, Robert) (tcf). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Gregory Haynes, Kim Melbye (Kirklin, Paul) (tcf). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss by Gregory Haynes, Kim Melbye. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo, #2 Declaration Exhibit A, #3 Declaration Exhibit B, #4 Declaration Exhibit C)(Kirklin, Paul) (tcf). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Paul Stephen Kirklin, re #6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/9/2021.(rmc) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***Document withdrawn per ECF #14 *** MOTION to Dismiss and/or Motion to Transfer by Gregory Haynes, Kim Melbye. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo, #2 Declaration Exhibit A, #3 Declaration Exhibit B, #4 Declaration Exhibit C)(Bonito, Robert)Attorney Robert A. Bonito added to party Gregory Haynes(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A. Bonito added to party Kim Melbye(pty:dft) QC mailer sent re: attorney's signature does not match account used to file document (tcf). Modified to withdraw on 8/11/2021 (tcf). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***Document withdrawn per ECF #14 *** NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Gregory Haynes, Kim Melbye (Bonito, Robert) QC mailer sent re: attorney's signature does not match account used to file document (tcf). Modified to withdraw on 8/11/2021 (tcf). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kirklin, Paul) QC mail sent, e-filed under an incorrect account (rmc). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16010950.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kirklin, Paul) QC mail sent, e-filed under an incorrect account (rmc). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16010833.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kirklin, Paul) (rmc). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hempstract, Inc. Kim Melbye served. (Lobbin, Stephen) (tcf). (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hempstract, Inc. Gregory Haynes served. (Lobbin, Stephen) (tcf). (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dxf)(jrd) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *90/748,239*, *90/748,264*, *90/748,269*, *90/748,276*, *90/748,283* (cc: USPTO)(dxf)(jrd) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Gregory Haynes, Kim Melbye (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15867785.), filed by Hempstract, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1171-JLS-MDD. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Lobbin, Stephen)(dxf)(jrd) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less