This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2021 at 10:46:33 (UTC).

Hemann et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Hemann filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-04097

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Hemann

Tracee Hemann

Defendant

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexis W McCumber

Attorney at Anastopoulo Law Firm LLC

32 Ann Street

Charleston, SC 29403

Eric Poulin

Attorney at Anastopoulo Law Firm LLC

32 Ann Street

Charleston, SC 29403

Roy T Willey, IV

Attorney at Anastopoulo Law Firm LLC

32 Ann Street, Unit B

Charleston, SC 29403

Defendant Attorney

Alfred Johnston Cox

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd

Po Box 7368, 1201 Main Street, Suite 1200

Columbia, SC 29202

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Michael Hemann, Tracee Hemann(McCumber, Alexis) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#21

(#21) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Hemann, Tracee Hemann.(McCumber, Alexis) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#20

(#20) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs' Local Rule 26.03 Answers due by 1/19/2021, Plaintiffs' ADR Statement/Certification due by 1/19/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/24/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/26/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/25/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/25/2021, Discovery due by 7/26/2021, Mediation Due by 8/2/2021, Motions due by 8/9/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 12/6/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/14/21. (kmca) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#19

(#19) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company(Cox, Alfred) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#18

(#18) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Cox, Alfred) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

17 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Consent Amended Scheduling Order

#17

(#17) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Michael Hemann, Tracee Hemann. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Cox, Alfred) Modified on 1/14/2021: to add joint filer as listed, to remove duplicate text (proposed order) (kmca). (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis W McCumber on behalf of Michael Hemann, Tracee Hemann (McCumber, Alexis) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#15

(#15) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/11/20. (kmca) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/4/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/19/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 1/19/2021, ADR Statement/Certification due by 1/19/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/24/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/26/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/26/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/26/2021, Discovery due by 5/26/2021, Motions due by 6/9/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 10/4/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/11/20. (kmca) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#12

(#12) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Hemann, Tracee Hemann.(Willey, Roy) Modified on 12/11/2020: to correct date filed (kmca). (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Roy T Willey, IV on behalf of Michael Hemann, Tracee Hemann (Willey, Roy) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Remand to Jennings B. Anderson, Nicholson Meredith & Anderson. (kmca) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/30/2020: to correct typo) (kmca). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1, #5 Answer to Complaint. (kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

1 #1

State Court Documents

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Michael Hemann, Tracee Hemann(McCumber, Alexis) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Hemann, Tracee Hemann.(McCumber, Alexis) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs' Local Rule 26.03 Answers due by 1/19/2021, Plaintiffs' ADR Statement/Certification due by 1/19/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/24/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/26/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/25/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/25/2021, Discovery due by 7/26/2021, Mediation Due by 8/2/2021, Motions due by 8/9/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 12/6/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/14/21. (kmca) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company(Cox, Alfred) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Cox, Alfred) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Michael Hemann, Tracee Hemann. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Cox, Alfred) Modified on 1/14/2021: to add joint filer as listed, to remove duplicate text (proposed order) (kmca). (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis W McCumber on behalf of Michael Hemann, Tracee Hemann (McCumber, Alexis) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/11/20. (kmca) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/4/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/19/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 1/19/2021, ADR Statement/Certification due by 1/19/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/24/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/26/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/26/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/26/2021, Discovery due by 5/26/2021, Motions due by 6/9/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 10/4/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/11/20. (kmca) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER #11 LR 26.01s. Reason: re-filed by attorney whose log-in matches signature. Corrected Filing Document Number #12 LR 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories. Modified filing date to that of original filing: 12/10/20. (kmca) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Hemann, Tracee Hemann.(Willey, Roy) Modified on 12/11/2020: to correct date filed (kmca). (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Roy T Willey, IV on behalf of Michael Hemann, Tracee Hemann (Willey, Roy) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #7 Notice Of Remand, to Jennings B. Anderson, jennings@nicholsonmeredith.com. ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Notice Of Remand, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jennings B. Anderson, Nicholson Meredith & Anderson, 109 West Court Avenue, Greenwood, SC 29648. (kmca) Modified on 11/30/2020: corrected #7 Notice of Remand emailed and mailed. (kmca). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Remand to Jennings B. Anderson, Nicholson Meredith & Anderson. (kmca) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/30/2020: to correct typo) (kmca). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1, #5 Answer to Complaint. (kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenwood County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-24-00953. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9493704), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfred Johnston Cox