This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 10:04:06 (UTC).

Helser et al v. Wright Medical Group Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Helser filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01138

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frank Helser

Doni Helser

Defendants

Wright Medical Group Inc

Wright Medical Technology Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Murray Bruce Wells

Attorney at Wells & Associates PLLC

81 Monroe Avenue, Suite 400

Memphis, TN 38103

N. Kirkland Pope

Attorney at Pope McGlamry P.C.

Post Office Box 19337

Atlanta, GA 31126-1337

Michael J. Blakely, Jr.

Attorney at Pope McGlamry P.C.

Post Office Box 19337

Atlanta, GA 31126-1337

Defendant Attorney

Sean K. Burke

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

505 9Th Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-2166

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) LETTER/ORDER scheduling an initial organizational meeting by telephone conference on 11/30/2020 at 10:30 a.m. The deadline for submitting proposals for a structure of the organization of plaintiffs' counsel is due 11/20/2020. It would be helpful to receive by 11/20/2020 a summary of the procedural setting of the cases. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/29/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean K. Burke on behalf of Wright Medical Group Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc (Burke, Sean) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Blakely, Jr on behalf of Doni Helser, Frank Helser (Blakely, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by N. Kirkland Pope on behalf of Doni Helser, Frank Helser (Pope, N.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Notification to Counsel. CORRECTION: The Order Upon Transfer was omitted from the docket entry, due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The document was added as an attachment to docket entry #11 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Helser et al v. Wright Medical Group Inc et al, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the USDC Arkansas Western and assigned case number 5:20-cv-05102, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-01138-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. Attached is a copy of Order Upon Transfer signed by Judge Baker. Electronic Notification signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/24/2020. (jbh) (Main Document added on 9/24/2020 to correct a clerical error)(jak). (Entered: 09/24/2020)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Case electronically transferred in from U.S. District Court, District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 5:20-cv-05102. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#9

(#9) MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to Eastern District of Arkansas. Documents transmitted as requested. (tg) [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Wright Medical Group, Inc. served on 9/8/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Wells, Murray) Modified to correct service date on 9/11/2020 (lgd). [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 9/8/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Wells, Murray) Modified to correct service dates on 9/11/2020 (lgd). [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2157023), filed by Frank Helser, Doni Helser.(Wells, Murray) [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Doni Helser, Frank Helser. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg) [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 06/09/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) LETTER/ORDER scheduling an initial organizational meeting by telephone conference on 11/30/2020 at 10:30 a.m. The deadline for submitting proposals for a structure of the organization of plaintiffs' counsel is due 11/20/2020. It would be helpful to receive by 11/20/2020 a summary of the procedural setting of the cases. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/29/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean K. Burke on behalf of Wright Medical Group Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc (Burke, Sean) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Blakely, Jr on behalf of Doni Helser, Frank Helser (Blakely, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by N. Kirkland Pope on behalf of Doni Helser, Frank Helser (Pope, N.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Notification to Counsel. CORRECTION: The Order Upon Transfer was omitted from the docket entry, due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The document was added as an attachment to docket entry #11 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Helser et al v. Wright Medical Group Inc et al, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the USDC Arkansas Western and assigned case number 5:20-cv-05102, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-01138-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. Attached is a copy of Order Upon Transfer signed by Judge Baker. Electronic Notification signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/24/2020. (jbh) (Main Document added on 9/24/2020 to correct a clerical error)(jak). (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case electronically transferred in from U.S. District Court, District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 5:20-cv-05102. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to Eastern District of Arkansas. Documents transmitted as requested. (tg) [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Wright Medical Group, Inc. served on 9/8/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Wells, Murray) Modified to correct service date on 9/11/2020 (lgd). [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 9/8/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Wells, Murray) Modified to correct service dates on 9/11/2020 (lgd). [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketTEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE regarding Proof of Service directed to Plaintiffs Doni Helser, Frank Helser. The docket does not reflect that proof of service or a motion and order to extend the time to complete service has been filed. No answer or other responsive pleading has been filed by the Defendant(s). The Plaintiff is directed to file proof of timely service, or a statement as to when such proof will be filed, within five (5) days of the filing of this Notice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). Proof of Service due by 9/15/2020. (src) [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Wright Medical Group, Inc for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint. (Wells, Murray) [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Wright Medical Technology for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint. (Wells, Murray) [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2157023), filed by Frank Helser, Doni Helser.(Wells, Murray) [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Doni Helser, Frank Helser. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg) [Transferred from arwd on 9/24/2020.] (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean K. Burke