This case was last updated from PACER on 03/05/2020 at 20:54:23 (UTC).

Hello LLC v. Lyft, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Hello LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lyft, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela A. Barker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02840

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hello LLC

139 Bell Street

Chagrin Falls, OH 44022

Defendant

Lyft, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy J. Cunning

Attorney at Scullin & Cunning

904 Windham Court

Boardman, OH 44512

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel M. Kavouras

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Michael K. Farrell

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Order of Case Dismissal: Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with prejudice is approved #11 . Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 1/30/2020. (L,Ja) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#11

(#11) Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with prejudice filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Kavouras, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

10 #1

Report of Parties' Planning Meeting

#10

(#10) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 2/5/2020 at 02:15 PM at Chambers 16A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(L,Ja) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#9

(#9) Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy. (L,Ja) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) Motion for extension of time until 2/3/2020 to answer filed by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Kavouras, Daniel) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#7

(#7) Certified copy of state court documents received from the Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV-19-924473. (J,FE) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#6

(#6) Motion for extension of time until 1/3/2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Kavouras, Daniel) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) Order: This matter was removed to this Court on December 6, 2019. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than December 20, 2019, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 12/9/2019. (L,Ja) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Lyft, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Kavouras, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Kavouras, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A - State Court Docket, Summons, Proof of Service, and Complaint

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-19-924473 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9665476.. Filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - State Court Docket, Summons, Proof of Service, and Complaint) (Kavouras, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketLAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Order of Case Dismissal: Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with prejudice is approved #11 . Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 1/30/2020. (L,Ja) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with prejudice filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Kavouras, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 2/5/2020 at 02:15 PM at Chambers 16A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(L,Ja) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy. (L,Ja) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketFILING ERROR Corporte Disclosure has been filed Notice by Clerk that Lyft, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document]granting #8 Parties' agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s answer due 2/3/2020. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 1/3/2020.(L,Ja) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion for extension of time until 2/3/2020 to answer filed by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Kavouras, Daniel) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certified copy of state court documents received from the Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV-19-924473. (J,FE) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting #6 Parties' agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s answer due 1/3/2020. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 12/10/2019.(L,Ja) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for extension of time until 1/3/2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Kavouras, Daniel) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order: This matter was removed to this Court on December 6, 2019. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than December 20, 2019, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 12/9/2019. (L,Ja) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketJudge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Lyft, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Kavouras, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Kavouras, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-19-924473 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9665476.. Filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - State Court Docket, Summons, Proof of Service, and Complaint) (Kavouras, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.