This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 08:46:41 (UTC).

Helfrich v. State of Nevada

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Helfrich filed an Other lawsuit against State of Nevada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01319

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Peter Jason Helfrich

Respondent

State of Nevada

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Unable to Forward re #5 Order,, addressed to Peter Jason Helfrich. (DRS) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER - Plaintiff shall either file an Application to Proceed in forma paupers or pay the filing fees in full on or before 9/3/2020. The Clerk shall mail plaintiff the proper form and instructions, a copy of the initiating documents and a copy of this order. Initiating documents are not yet filed by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; Non-Inmate IFP Application and instructions, Notice and consent to service by email; copy of 1-1 and 3 enclosed with copy of order. - DRS) Modified on 8/4/2020 (DRS). (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal - Petition is restricted to Case participants only as it contains personal identifiers. ) (DRS) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mail Returned as Unable to Forward re #5 Order,, addressed to Peter Jason Helfrich. (DRS) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - Plaintiff shall either file an Application to Proceed in forma paupers or pay the filing fees in full on or before 9/3/2020. The Clerk shall mail plaintiff the proper form and instructions, a copy of the initiating documents and a copy of this order. Initiating documents are not yet filed by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; Non-Inmate IFP Application and instructions, Notice and consent to service by email; copy of 1-1 and 3 enclosed with copy of order. - DRS) Modified on 8/4/2020 (DRS). (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUPPLEMENT to 3 Affidavit by Petitioner Peter Jason Helfrich. Limited to Case participants only as it contains personal identifiers. (DRS) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal - Petition is restricted to Case participants only as it contains personal identifiers. ) (DRS) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (RT) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less