This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/23/2022 at 04:57:06 (UTC).

Heilner, Jr. et al v. Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Heilner, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jennifer P. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00616

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer P. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Earl K. Heilner, Jr.

Kathryn Heilner

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC

Bayer Cropscience, Inc.

Burham, LLC

CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation

Dyntherm Boiler Manufacturing

Easco Boiler Corp.

Flexible Technologies, Inc.

Goodrich Corporation

Goulds Pumps, LLC

Industrical Holdings Corporation

John Crane, Inc.

Linde, LLC

Lockheed Martin Corporation

McCormick Asbestos Company

Morgan Engineering

Reunion Industries, Inc.

Schneider Electric USA, Inc.

Marley-Wylain Company, LLC

Earl K. Heilner, Jr.

Kathryn Heilner

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Cross Defendant

Lockheed Martin Corporation

152 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason B. Duncan

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter Angelos, P.C.

2001 N. Front Street, Bldg. 3 Suite 330

Harrisburg, PA 17102

Lauren S Linsenbach

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter G. Angelos

2001 N. Front Street

Bldg. 3, SU 330

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Catherine N Jasons

Attorney at Kelley Jasons McGowan Spinelli Hanna & Reber LLP

Two Liberty Place, Suite 1900

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Tiffany F Turner

Attorney at Dickie McCarney & Chilcote

1650 Arch Street, Suite 2110

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John R Brumberg

Attorney at Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP

One Oxford Center, 38Th Fl., 301 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Ryan L. Leonard

Attorney at POST & SCHELL, P.C.

1600 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Four Penn Center

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Christina M. Rideout

Attorney at Kelley Jasons McGowan Spinelli & Hanna, L.L.P.

Two Liberty Place, Suite 1900

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Jason B. Duncan

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter Angelos, P.C.

2001 N. Front Street, Bldg. 3 Suite 330

Harrisburg, PA 17102

Lauren S Linsenbach

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter G. Angelos

2001 N. Front Street

Bldg. 3, SU 330

Other Attorneys

Tracey McDevitt Hagan

Attorney at Reilly Janiczek McDevitt Henrich & Cholden, P.C.

The Widener Building, One South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

John A. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Wilbraham, Lawler & Buba

1818 Market Street, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Eric J Kadish

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy LLC

Three Logan Square, Suite 3710, 1717 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Adam A. Desipio

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP (US)

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street, 49Th Fl.

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7300

Cory C. Sidelsky

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1650 Market Street, Ste 4900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

G. Daniel Bruch

Attorney at Swartz Campbell LLC

50 S. 16Th Street

Liberty Two Bldg., FL 28

Peter L. Lejeune

Joan P. Depfer

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Lindsey Lunney

Susan M Valinis

Joseph I. Fontak

Attorney at Leader & Berkon LLP

1515 Market Street, Suite 1200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Alan R. Gries

Attorney at Gibbons, P.C.

1700 Two Logan Square, 18Th & Arch Sts.

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2769

Gregory M. Stokes

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#72

(#72) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Gregory M. Stokes. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/20/22. (eo) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#71

(#71) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Peter L. Lejeune. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/20/22. (eo) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#70

(#70) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to G. Daniel Bruch, Jr. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/20/22. (eo) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#69

(#69) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pollock Research & Design, Inc.. (Gries, Alan) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#68

(#68) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pollock Research & Design, Inc..(Gries, Alan) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#67

(#67) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Union Carbide Corporation. (Jasons, Catherine) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#66

(#66) NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Jasons, Catherine) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#65

(#65) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Bayer Cropscience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc.. (Jasons, Catherine) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#64

(#64) NOTICE by Bayer Cropscience, Inc. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Jasons, Catherine) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kadish, Eric) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J Kadish on behalf of A.O. Smith Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kadish, Eric) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#3

(#3) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson (eo) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp. identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc (Scotland).(gs) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foster Wheeler LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 ), filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(gs) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Gregory M. Stokes. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/20/22. (eo) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Peter L. Lejeune. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/20/22. (eo) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to G. Daniel Bruch, Jr. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/20/22. (eo) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pollock Research & Design, Inc.. (Gries, Alan) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pollock Research & Design, Inc..(Gries, Alan) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Union Carbide Corporation. (Jasons, Catherine) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Jasons, Catherine) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Bayer Cropscience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc.. (Jasons, Catherine) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE by Bayer Cropscience, Inc. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Jasons, Catherine) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Catherine N Jasons on behalf of Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation Attorney Catherine N. Jasons is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5949830.. (Jasons, Catherine) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, American Premier Underwriters, Aurora Pump Company, Automation Industries, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Burham, LLC, CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Columbus McKinnon Corporation, Compudyne, LLC, Cooper Industries, LLC, Corning Inc., on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories Business Division, Crane Company, DAP Products, Dyntherm Boiler Manufacturing, ECR International Inc., Individually and as Sessor-in-Interest to Utica Boilers, Earl K. Heilner, Jr., Hobart Brothers Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Successor to Allied-Signal, Inc., Successor to Bendix Corporation, Honeywell, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Parent Company of and/or Successor to DeLaval Pump & Steam Turbine Co., Easco Boiler Corp., Eaton Corporation, as Sussor-in-Interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc., FMC Corporation, Individually and as successor in interest to Sterns Electric Corporation and Link-Belt Co./Construction Equipment Group, Flexible Technologies, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp., GTE Operations Support, Inc., Successor in Interest to GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Greene, Tweed & Co, Inc., H.B. Fuller Company, H.B. Smith Company, Inc., a Division of Mestek, Inc., Hajoca Corp., Kathryn Heilner, Industrical Holdings Corporation, J.H. France Refractories Company, John Crane, Inc., Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, Inc., Kerite LLC, Linde, LLC, Marley-Wylain Company, LLC, McCormick Asbestos Company, Mestek, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc., Mobil Corporation, Morgan Engineering, Pecora Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Poillock Research & Design, Inc., RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC, Reed Finanncial Corp., Reunion Industries, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sid Harvey Industries, Inc., Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Terex Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The John Wood Company, LLC, The Lincoln Electric Company, The Okonite Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, a Division of Thiem Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Zurn Industries, LLC by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, American Premier Underwriters, Aurora Pump Company, Automation Industries, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Burham, LLC, CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Columbus McKinnon Corporation, Compudyne, LLC, Cooper Industries, LLC, Corning Inc., on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories Business Division, Crane Company, DAP Products, Dyntherm Boiler Manufacturing, ECR International Inc., Individually and as Sessor-in-Interest to Utica Boilers, Easco Boiler Corp., Eaton Corporation, as Sussor-in-Interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc., FMC Corporation, Individually and as successor in interest to Sterns Electric Corporation and Link-Belt Co./Construction Equipment Group, Flexible Technologies, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp., GTE Operations Support, Inc., Successor in Interest to GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Greene, Tweed & Co, Inc., H.B. Fuller Company, H.B. Smith Company, Inc., a Division of Mestek, Inc., Hajoca Corp., Kathryn Heilner, Earl K. Heilner, Jr., Hobart Brothers Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Successor to Allied-Signal, Inc., Successor to Bendix Corporation, Honeywell, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Parent Company of and/or Successor to DeLaval Pump & Steam Turbine Co., Industrical Holdings Corporation, J.H. France Refractories Company, John Crane, Inc., Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, Inc., Kerite LLC, Linde, LLC, Marley-Wylain Company, LLC, McCormick Asbestos Company, Mestek, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc., Mobil Corporation, Morgan Engineering, Pecora Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Poillock Research & Design, Inc., RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC, Reed Finanncial Corp., Reunion Industries, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sid Harvey Industries, Inc., Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Terex Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The John Wood Company, LLC, The Lincoln Electric Company, The Okonite Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, a Division of Thiem Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Zurn Industries, LLC by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Turner, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Flexible Technologies, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by John Crane, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group plc. for John Crane, Inc.. (Turner, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John Crane, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kadish, Eric) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J Kadish on behalf of A.O. Smith Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kadish, Eric) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson (eo) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp. identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc (Scotland).(gs) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foster Wheeler LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 ), filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(gs) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where REUNION INDUSTRIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Morgan Engineering Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCE THERMAL HYDRONICS INC (FKA THE HYDROTHERM CORPORATION) is a litigant