This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2019 at 07:12:51 (UTC).

Heidi Marsh v. Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Heidi Marsh filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Internal Revenue Service, U S Department of the Treasury. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Suzanne H. Segal, Dean D. Pregerson and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00587

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Suzanne H. Segal

Presiding Judges

Dean D. Pregerson

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heidi Marsh

San Marino, CA 91108

Defendant

Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassignment Pursuant to General Order 16-05 filed on 2/20/2019. The case number will now read CV 19-587-DMG (SSx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#7

(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#2

(#2) 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury. (esa) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

1 #1

CV-71

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury.Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Susan H. Segal, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by plaintiff Heidi Marsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Heidi Marsh, (esa) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00587 DMG(SSx). (rn) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassignment Pursuant to General Order 16-05 filed on 2/20/2019. The case number will now read CV 19-587-DMG (SSx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00587 DMG(SSx). (rn) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Heidi Marsh, (esa) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury. (esa) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury.Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Susan H. Segal, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by plaintiff Heidi Marsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.