This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 10:54:07 (UTC).

Hee Soon Park v. Lowes Home Centers, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Hee Soon Park filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Lowes Home Centers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hee Soon Park

Defendants

Lowes Home Centers, LLC

Lowes HIW, Inc.

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason J Kim

Attorney at So Cal Equal Access Group

101 South Western Avenue 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Jason T Yoon

Attorney at So Cal Equal Access Group

101 South Western Avenue 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90004

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-32604111 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Hee Soon Park(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hee Soon Park. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Hee Soon Park. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Lowes HIW, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect Document is attached to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court has reviewed the Response filed by Plaintiff and Plaintiff's counsel to the Court's Order to Show Cause Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act, California Disabled Persons Act, California Health and Safety Code, and negligence claims. The Court therefore DISMISSES these claims WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (lc) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Hee Soon Parkto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #15 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and any other state law claim asserted in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims, if any, and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (lc) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Hee Soon Park. upon Lowes HIW, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/18/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Attorney for Defendant. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Hee Soon Park. upon Lowes Home Centers, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/18/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Attorney for Defendant. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER REGARDING PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. The Court finds that there is good cause to institute a limited scheduling order concerning basic case prosecution for cases under the Americans With Disabilities Act involving physical barriers in places of public accommodation. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC ENUMERATED REQUIREMENTS AND DEADLINES THEREIN). The failure to comply with this Order in a particular case will result in a sanction of $300.00 payable to the clerk of the court within two weeks of Plaintiff being given notice of noncompliance and dismissal for lack of prosecution. The Court finds these sanctions sufficient and necessary to deter violations of the Order and to achieve timely prosecution of these cases without unnecessary intervention by the Court. (lc) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#11) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect Document is attached to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Lowes HIW, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Hee Soon Park. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hee Soon Park. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-32604111 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Hee Soon Park(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWE'S HIW INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason J Kim