This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 07:03:48 (UTC).

Hedrick v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Hedrick filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dwane L. Tinsley and John T. Copenhaver, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00449

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dwane L. Tinsley

Presiding Judge

John T. Copenhaver, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hope Hedrick

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert W. Gillikin, II

Attorney at RUTTER MILLS

160 West Brambleton Avenue

Norfolk, VA 23510

Defendant Attorney

Nora R. Koch

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

6Th Floor, 300 Spring Garden Street

Philadelphia, PA 19123

 

Court Documents

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS directing that the #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs is GRANTED; the Clerk shall issue the summons(es); Plaintiff shall serve the summons(es) and complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 7/1/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (msa)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSET ANSWER DEADLINE as to Andrew Saul for 9/18/2020. (ts) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Hope Marie Hedrick for service upon Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Andrew Saul served on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Person Served: U.S. Attorney SDWV, V. Dickerson. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 7/20/2020. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 7/20/2020. (Gillikin, Robert) (Modified on 8/20/2020 to convert event to summons returned, executed in a social security case and to set answer date)(ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (msa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS directing that the #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs is GRANTED; the Clerk shall issue the summons(es); Plaintiff shall serve the summons(es) and complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 7/1/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (msa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to United States Attorney for the Southern District of WV, #3 Proposed Summons as to Attorney General of the United States, #4 Proposed Summons as to Commissioner of Social Security) (st)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION by Hope Hedrick to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (st)

    Read MoreRead Less