This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2021 at 08:57:50 (UTC).

Hedrick et al v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 Hedrick filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Outback Steakhouse of Florida, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00144

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Blake Hedrick

Jennifer Hedrick

B.H.

Defendants

Outback Steakhouse of Florida, Inc.

Bloomin' Brands, Inc.

Bloomin' Brands International, LLC

MDC NC1, LP

MDC Coast 4, LLC

Realty Income Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald S. Higley, II

Attorney at Lanier Law Group, PA

4915 Piedmont Parkway, Suite 104

Jamestown, NC 27282

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Burke

Attorney at Young Moore and Henderson, PA

3101 Glenwood Avenue, Suite 200

Raleigh, NC 27612

Christopher A. Page

Attorney at Young, Moore & Henderson, P.A.

3101 Glenwood Avenue, Suite 200

Raleigh, NC 27612

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk, to the Honorable Shelena Smith, Clerk of Court of Robeson County, transmitting certified copies of Order #28 and Judgment #29 . (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) JUDGMENT - in accordance with the courts order entered October 7, 2021, more particularly described therein, that the captioned action be and hereby is remanded to Robeson County Superior Court. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/7/2021. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #27 Joint Motion to Remand. The court hereby orders this matter to be remanded to the Superior Court of Robeson County, North Carolina. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/7/2021. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #27 Joint MOTION to Remand. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Bloomin' Brands International, LLC, Bloomin' Brands, Inc., MDC Coast 4, LLC, MDC NC1, LP, Outback Steakhouse of Florida, Inc., Realty Income Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Page, Christopher) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATION and Agreement Regarding Damages by B.H., Jennifer Hedrick (Higley, Donald) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #25 Stipulation. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 and Section IV(A) of the court's CM/ECF policies and procedures manual require that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. Counsel is directed to refile. Instructions for how to make a document text searchable is located on the court's website under the "CM/ECF" section in the "instructional guides" category. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION and Agreement Regarding Damages by B.H. (Higley, Donald) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 10/19/21. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/14/2021. (Collins, S.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2021: #1 ISO - Signed) (Collins, S.). (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Notice of Appearance filed by Donald S. Higley, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Higley, Donald) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Financial Disclosure Statement by MDC Coast 4, LLC (Page, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Financial Disclosure Statement by MDC NC1, LP (Page, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Financial Disclosure Statement by Bloomin' Brands International, LLC (Page, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Financial Disclosure Statement by Bloomin' Brands, Inc. (Page, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Financial Disclosure Statement by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, Inc. (Page, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher A. Page on behalf of All Defendants. (Page, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants (Redacted) from Robeson County Superior Court, case number 21 CVS 771. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6188365), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Redacted Summons and Complaint) (Page, Christopher) Modified on 8/25/2021 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice regarding 1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Jonathan Holder of Lanier Law Group, PA at 4915 Piedmont Parkway, Ste. 104, Jamestown, NC 27282 mailed via US Mail on August 17, 2021. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: 1 Notice of Removal. Defendants are directed to refile all documents, DE # 1 through DE # 10 , including attachments, with redactions made to comply with Rule 5.2 of the Fed.R.Civ. P. implementing the privacy requirements and redacting the name of the minor plaintiff. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketTEXT ORDER: Rule 5.2 of the Fed. R. Civ. P. implements the privacy requirements of the E-Government Act of 2002 and requires parties to redact certain personal identifying information, the names of any minor, and financial account numbers from all documents filed. A plaintiff in this action is a minor whose name is protected under Rule 5.2. However, all of the documents filed in this court by defendant, as well as the caption, contain the name of the minor plaintiff. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to place the documents filed by defendant [DE-1 through DE-10] under seal, and to amend the caption to disclose only the minor plaintiff's initials. Plaintiffs have 14 days after appearing in this action to file a motion to seal these documents. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/17/2021.A copy of this Text Order was sent via US mail to Attorney Jonathan Holder, of Lanier Law Group, PA at 4915 Piedmont Parkway, Ste. 104, Jamestown, NC 27282. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REALTY INCOME CORPORATION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where B.H. is a litigant

Latest cases where OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant