This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2022 at 15:43:53 (UTC).

Hedick v. Kraft Heinz Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2019 Hedick filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Kraft Heinz Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01339

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

George A. Hedick, Jr.

Iron Workers District Council (Philadelphia and Vicinity) Retirement and Pension Plan

Union Asset Management Holding AG

Sjunde AP-Fonden

Timber Hill LLC

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

Cam Hung Diep

James Tarsy

The Chesson Limited Partnership

Krupa Global Investments

Earl Chesson

The New York City Funds

Michael Guzzi

Arca Investments, a.s.

Union Asset Management Holding AG

Sjunde AP-Fonden

EARL G. CHESSON REVOCABLE TRYST U/A DTD

Defendants

Bernardo Hees

David H. Knopf

Paulo Basilio

The Kraft Heinz Company

3G Capital Partners II LP

3G Capital Partners LTD.

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sharan Nirmul

John Michael Robinson

Jonathan Christian Bunge

Andrew J Entwistle

Andrew Mitchell Sher

Sean Michael Riegert

Petitioner Attorneys

Carl V. Malmstrom

Phillip C Kim

C. Philip Curley

Robert C. Finkel

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Ehrlich

Daniel J Kramer

William A. Clareman

Dean Nicholas Panos

Gabriel Gillett

Howard Steven Suskin

50 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#324

No Description Available

#310

No Description Available

#150

#343

No Description Available

#342

No Description Available

#341

No Description Available

#340

No Description Available

#339

No Description Available

#338

No Description Available

#337

No Description Available

336 #3

Letter of Request for Northern Trust

336 #2

Letter of Request for BlackRock

336 #1

Letter of Request for State Street

336 #336

Main Document

#335

No Description Available

#334

No Description Available

#333

No Description Available

711 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#362) NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Ehrlich for presentment of motion to seal document, #361 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/3/2022 at 09:15 AM. (Ehrlich, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#361) MOTION by Defendants 3G Capital Partners, 3G Capital Partners II LP, 3G Capital Partners LP, 3G Capital Partners LTD., 3G Capital, Inc., 3G Global Food Holdings GP LP, 3G Global Food Holdings, L.P., Paulo Basilio, Alexandre Behring, Bernardo Hees, David H. Knopf, Rafael Oliveira, The Kraft Heinz Company to seal document sealed response,, #360 (Ehrlich, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#360) SEALED RESPONSE by 3G Capital Partners, 3G Capital Partners II LP, 3G Capital Partners LP, 3G Capital Partners LTD., 3G Capital, Inc., 3G Global Food Holdings GP LP, 3G Global Food Holdings, L.P., Paulo Basilio, Alexandre Behring, Bernardo Hees, David H. Knopf, Rafael Oliveira, The Kraft Heinz Company, George Zoghbi to MOTION by Plaintiffs Booker Enterprises Pty Ltd., Sjunde AP-Fonden, Union Asset Management Holding AG to certify class #346 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit N, #7 Exhibit O, #8 Exhibit P, #9 Exhibit U, #10 Exhibit V)(Ehrlich, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#359) MEMORANDUM by 3G Capital Partners, 3G Capital Partners II LP, 3G Capital Partners LP, 3G Capital Partners LTD., 3G Capital, Inc., 3G Global Food Holdings GP LP, 3G Global Food Holdings, L.P., Paulo Basilio, Alexandre Behring, Bernardo Hees, David H. Knopf, Rafael Oliveira, The Kraft Heinz Company, George Zoghbi in Opposition to motion to certify class,, #346 [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew J. Ehrlich in Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V)(Ehrlich, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Docket(#358) Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Sjunde AP-Fonden, Union Asset Management Holding AG (Sinderson, Katherine) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docket(#357) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint motion for leave to file oversized brief #355 is granted. Notice of motion date of 5/12/2022 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docket(#356) NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Ehrlich for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #355 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/12/2022 at 09:15 AM. (Ehrlich, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docket(#355) MOTION by Defendants Paulo Basilio, Alexandre Behring, Bernardo Hees, David H. Knopf, Rafael Oliveira, The Kraft Heinz Company, George Zoghbi for leave to file excess pages (Joint Motion for Leave to File an Oversized Brief) (Ehrlich, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket(#354) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion to appear pro hac vice #353 is granted. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docket(#353) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19384108. (Berman, Stuart) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
345 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 4/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff George A. Hedick, Jr by Steven Francis Molo (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff George A. Hedick, Jr by Megan Cunniff Church (Church, Megan) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant David H. Knopf (jjr, ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Paulo Basilio, Bernardo Hees, and The Kraft Heinz Company. (dal, ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff George A. Hedick, Jr by Gerald P Meyer (Meyer, Gerald) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Meyer, Gerald) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by George A. Hedick, Jr; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15518760. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Plaintiff)(Meyer, Gerald) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less