This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2020 at 09:38:23 (UTC).

Hector v. Trans Union Rental Screening Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 Hector filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Trans Union Rental Screening Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. P. Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01794

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Aird

Kaila Hector

Defendant

Trans Union Rental Screening Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Wilson Hanes

Attorney at CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES

Suite 1A, 763 J. Clyde Morris Boulevard

Newport News, VA 23601

Leonard A. Bennett

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates, P.C.-NN VA

Suite 1-A, 763 J Clyde Morris Blvd.

Newport News, VA 23601

Andrew J. Guzzo

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo, PLC

Suite 202, 3925 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

Kristi C. Kelly

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo, PLC

Suite 202, 3925 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

E. Michelle Drake

Attorney at Berger & Montague, P.C. -MN

Suite 505, 43 Se Main Street

Minneapolis, MN 55414

Casey S. Nash

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates, P.C.-VA

Suite 600, 1800 Diagonal Road

Alexandria, VA 22314

Joseph C. Hashmall

Attorney at Berger & Montague, P.C. -MN

Suite 505, 43 Se Main Street

Minneapolis, MN 55414

Craig C. Marchiando

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates, P.C.-NN VA

Suite 1-A, 763 J Clyde Morris Blvd.

Newport News, VA 23601

Defendant Attorneys

Albert E. Hartmann

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

10 S. Wacker Dr., 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Travis Aaron Sabalewski

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP -VA

Suite 1700, 901 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Kristen DeGrande

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP -IL

10 South Wacker Drive, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael O'Neil

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP -IL

10 South Wacker Drive, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Alison R.W. Toepp

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP -VA

Suite 1700, 901 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

49 #1

*Restricted*

#49

#48

#47

46 #1

Proposed Order

#46

#45

#44

#35

#7

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (aar) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00790. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to Northern District of Georgia per #48 MDL Transfer Order. (smej, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MDL Transfer Order - IN RE: TRANSUNION RENTAL SCREENING SOLUTIONS, INC., FAIR CREDIT REPORTING ACT (FCRA) LITIGATION. MDL Number 2933. Signed by Ellen Segal Huvelle, Acting Chair, Panel on Multi District Litigation Panel on 4/27/2020. (smej, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - Upon consideration of the #46 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Elizabeth W. Hanes, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 4/16/2020. (smej, ) (Main Document 47 replaced on 4/16/2020) (smej, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William Aird, Kaila Hector. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hanes, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) STATUS REPORT by Trans Union Rental Screening Solutions, Inc.. (Sabalewski, Travis) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER - The Court GRANTS IN PART the Motion #41 . No later than May 1, 2020, Plaintiffs SHALL respond to the Motion to Dismiss, #35 . No later than April 24, 2020, Plaintiffs and TURSS SHALL file a joint Status Update addressing whether the JPML has ruled on TURSS's Motion to Transfer. If the JPML rules on TURSS's Motion to Transfer before that date, the Court encourages the Parties to file the joint Status Update as soon as they are able. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/25/2020. (smej, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER. For the reasons set forth in TURSS's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to File Under Seal, and because it otherwise appears right and proper so to do, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion to File Under Seal #37 and ORDERS that Exhibit A to TURSS's Motion to Dismiss, and alternatively, Motion to Transfer, be filed under seal. This document shall remain sealed through the duration of these proceedings, including any stays or appeals. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/23/20. (jsau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Memorandum in Support re #41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by William Aird, Kaila Hector. (Bennett, Leonard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Charles O'Neil and Certification of Local Counsel Alison R.W. Toepp Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6972432. by Trans Union Rental Screening Solutions, Inc.. (Toepp, Alison) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union Rental Screening Solutions, Inc.. (Toepp, Alison) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trans Union Rental Screening Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toepp, Alison) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase Reassigned to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (smej, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - The plaintiff contends that this case will involve interpreting the settlement agreement in Clark and Anderson. Accordingly, in the interest of judicial efficiency and economy, the Court REASSIGNS this case to Judge Lauck. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 11/18/2019. (smej, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Kaila Hector of Related Case (Bennett, Leonard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Trans Union Rental Screening Solutions, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/29/2019) (jsau, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.. (smej, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Kaila Hector. (Bennett, Leonard) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/29/2019) (jsau, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6906565), filed by Kaila Hector. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bennett, Leonard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/27/2020.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Hashmall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth W. Hanes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Carley Marchiando