This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:27:58 (UTC).

Heckenlively v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Heckenlively filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary K. Dimke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-05198

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary K. Dimke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheena Heckenlively

Defendant

Andrew M Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chad L Hatfield

Attorney at Hatfield Law PLLC

8131 W Klamath Court, Suite D

Kennewick, WA 99336

Defendant Attorney

Timothy Michael Durkin

Attorney at U S Attorney's Office - SPO

920 W Riverside Suite 300, P O Box 1494

Spokane, WA 99210-1494

 

Court Documents

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheena Heckenlively re Andrew M Saul. (Hatfield, Chad) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (EW, Law Clerk) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued to General Counsel, Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General) as to Andrew M Saul.(AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by 10/30/2020. Case Management Deadline set for 10/30/2020. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Sheena Heckenlively. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hatfield, Chad) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/20/2020) (AY, Case Administrator). Modified on 10/20/2020 to correct spelling of Plaintiff's first name in caption of document (AY, Case Administrator). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less