This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:07:27 (UTC).

Heck v Forest River

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Heck filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Forest River. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Wesley Hendrix. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00081

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Wesley Hendrix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bob Heck

Defendant

Forest River Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig M Patrick

Attorney at Patrick Law Firm PC

6244 E. Lovers Lane

Dallas, TX 75214

Defendant Attorneys

Craig D Dillard

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

1000 Louisiana, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002

Robert Patrick Arthur

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

1000 Louisiana, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77002-2099

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Before the Court is the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Dkt. No. #6 . The Court instructs the Clerk of Court to enter this dismissal and terminate the case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), permitting dismissal of an action without a court order. All causes of action are dismissed with prejudice against all parties. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/14/2020) (pnp) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#6

(#6) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Bob Heck. (Patrick, Craig) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Forest River Inc. (Arthur, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Forest River, Inc is therefore ordered to obtain local counsel or file a motion to proceed without local counsel by 9/4/2020. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/18/2020) (dsr) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party shall confer at a scheduling conference no later than 9/2/2020. A Joint Report shall be filed on or before 9/16/2020. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/18/2020) (dsr) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (dsr) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Forest River Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11085772) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Dillard, Craig) (Attachments 2 and 3 replaced to flatten image on 8/18/2020) (dsr). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Before the Court is the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Dkt. No. #6 . The Court instructs the Clerk of Court to enter this dismissal and terminate the case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), permitting dismissal of an action without a court order. All causes of action are dismissed with prejudice against all parties. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/14/2020) (pnp) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Bob Heck. (Patrick, Craig) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Forest River Inc. (Arthur, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Forest River, Inc is therefore ordered to obtain local counsel or file a motion to proceed without local counsel by 9/4/2020. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/18/2020) (dsr) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party shall confer at a scheduling conference no later than 9/2/2020. A Joint Report shall be filed on or before 9/16/2020. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/18/2020) (dsr) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (dsr) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Forest River Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11085772) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Dillard, Craig) (Attachments 2 and 3 replaced to flatten image on 8/18/2020) (dsr). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less