This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/05/2022 at 07:28:57 (UTC).

Heck v. Amazon.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 Heck filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-03986

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julia Heck

New York, NY 10025

Defendants

Amazon.com, Inc.

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Audible, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George Volney Granade

Attorney at Reese LLP

8484 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 515

Los Angeles, CA 90211

Sue Jung Nam

Attorney at Reese LLP

100 West 93Rd Street, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10025

Michael Robert Reese

Attorney at Reese LLP

100 West 93Rd Street, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10025

Defendant Attorneys

Jedediah Wakefield

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Brian David Buckley

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

1191 Second Ave., 10Th Fl.

Seattle, WA 98101

Janie Yoo Miller

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

228 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Matthew Berman Becker

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Esther D. Galan

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

555 California Street, Floor 12

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING AS MOOT #19 MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Sue Jung Nam (Nam, Sue) (Filed on 8/29/2022) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#22

(#22) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint ) filed byJulia Heck. (Reese, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2022) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#21

(#21) FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Amazon.com, Inc., Audible, Inc.. Filed by Julia Heck. (Reese, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2022) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

19 #4

Proposed Order

19 #3

Exhibit 2 to Wakefield Declaration

19 #2

Exhibit 1 to Wakefield Declaration

19 #1

Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support

19 #19

Main Document

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jedediah Wakefield (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon.com, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Declaration

1 #1

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING AS MOOT #19 MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Sue Jung Nam (Nam, Sue) (Filed on 8/29/2022) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint ) filed byJulia Heck. (Reese, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2022) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Amazon.com, Inc., Audible, Inc.. Filed by Julia Heck. (Reese, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2022) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Request for Judicial Notice re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed byAmazon.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2022 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 8/26/2022. Replies due by 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Wakefield Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Wakefield Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White Granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian D. Buckley. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2022) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Brian Buckley ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17372963.) filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Buckley, Brian) (Filed on 7/21/2022) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 20, 2022. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2022 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsw Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argume nt at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jswcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 13, 2022 at 5:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 07/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/8/2022) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by George Volney Granade on behalf of Plaintiff Julia Heck and the Proposed Class (Granade, George) (Filed on 7/8/2022) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2022 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Esther D. Galan (Galan, Esther) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Janie Yoo Miller (Miller, Janie) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Berman Becker (Becker, Matthew) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jedediah Wakefield (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon.com, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/21/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Humboldt County Superior. Their case number is CV2200665. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17330659). Filed byAmazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less