This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2020 at 11:34:44 (UTC).

Hebert v. Republic Services Alliance Group Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Hebert filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Republic Services Alliance Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J Juneau and Patrick J Hanna. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00622

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J Juneau

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole Hebert

Defendants

BFI Waste Services, LLC

Republic Services Alliance Group, Inc.

Steve Sytsma

B F I Waste Services L L C doing business as Allied Waste Services of Acadiana -Scott/Republic Services of Acadiana -Scott

Republic Services Alliance Group Inc doing business as Allied Waste Services of Acadiana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory K Moroux

Onebane Law Firm, P O Box 3507

Lafayette, LA 70502-3507

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew John Halverson

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins et al (LAF)

325 Settlers Trace Blvd Ste 201

Lafayette, LA 70508

Owen T Hill

Attorney at Littler Mendelson (ALT)

3344 Peachtree Rd N E Ste 1500

Atlanta, GA 30326

Gregory Guidry

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins et al (LAF)

325 Settlers Trace Blvd Ste 201

Lafayette, LA 70508

Ryan Edward Griffitts

Attorney at Littler Mendelson (DAL)

2001 Ross Ave Ste 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Philip L Lu

Attorney at Littler Mendelson (ALT)

3344 Peachtree Rd N E Ste 1500

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#19

#17

#16

#14

#13

10 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order

6 #2

Proposed order Granting Motion to Dismiss

6 #1

Memorandum / Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit 1-11

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) JUDGMENT adopting #17 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that, consistent with the Report and Recommendation, Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Rec. Doc. #6 should be GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART, AND DENIED IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants Motion is GRANTED insofar as it seeks dismissal of Plaintiffs LUTPA, unjust enrichment, and defamation claims. Defendants Motion is DENIED insofar as it seeks dismissal under the LWPA. The Defendants Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE insofar as it seeks dismissal of Plaintiffs claims for declaratory relief (regarding nullity of the Severance Agreement) and for breach of contract. Defendants Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE insofar as it seeks dismissal of Plaintiffs claims against Sytsma. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days from entry of this judgment to amend her Petition in order to state claims for declaratory relief regarding nullification of the Severance Agreement and breach of contract. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 7/8/2020. (crt,Guidry, C) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/8/2020. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docket(#18) ELECTRONIC ORDER - A Report and Recommendation having been issued regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Rec. Doc. 6), the hearing set for July 16, 2020 is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/24/2020. (crt,Coreil, H) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Republic Services Alliance Group Inc, B F I Waste Services L L C. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons explained herein, the Court recommends that Republic's Motion be GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART, AND DENIED IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Defendants right to re-urge the Motion after an opportunity for Plaintiff to amend as outlined herein. Objections to R&R due by 7/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/23/2020. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by B F I Waste Services L L C, Republic Services Alliance Group Inc. (aty,Griffitts, Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/17/2020. (crt,Coreil, H) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nicole Hebert. (aty,Moroux, Gregory) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Owen T Hill for B F I Waste Services L L C and Republic Services Alliance Group Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/4/2020. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Philip L Lu for B F I Waste Services L L C and Republic Services Alliance Group Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/4/2020. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by B F I Waste Services L L C, Republic Services Alliance Group Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Griffitts, Ryan) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 7/9/2020 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by B F I Waste Services L L C, Republic Services Alliance Group Inc. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(aty,Griffitts, Ryan) Modified on 5/26/2020 to correct motion event (Dauterive, C). (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET by B F I Waste Services L L C, Republic Services Alliance Group Inc, Steve Sytsma. (aty,Halverson, Andrew) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/19/2020. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/18/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO REMOVAL by Steve Sytsma. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. B F I Waste Services L L C answer due 5/22/2020; Republic Services Alliance Group Inc answer due 5/22/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BFI Waste Services, LLC, Republic Services Alliance Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Republic Services Inc, Corporate Parent Allied Waste North America L L C, Corporate Parent Allied Waste Industries L L C for BFI Waste Services, LLC. (aty,Halverson, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette, Case Number 20201845 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4264935) filed by Republic Services Alliance Group, Inc., BFI Waste Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11)(Attorney Andrew John Halverson added to party BFI Waste Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew John Halverson added to party Republic Services Alliance Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Halverson, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BFI Waste Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where REPUBLIC SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Kent Moroux, Jr.