This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2020 at 07:11:54 (UTC).

Hebert v. Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Hebert filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Allied Rubber Gasket Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mitchell D. Dembin, William Q. Hayes and Dana M. Sabraw. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01350

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mitchell D. Dembin

Presiding Judges

William Q. Hayes

Dana M. Sabraw

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Leland J. Hebert

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Todd C. Atkins

Attorney at Atkins & Davidson, APC

2261 Rutherford Road

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Paul A. Stewart

Attorney at Knobbe Martens

2040 Main Street, 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Steven J Nataupsky

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear

2040 Main Street, Suite 1400

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Nataupsky on behalf of Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc. (Nataupsky, Steven)Attorney Steven J Nataupsky added to party Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven J Nataupsky added to party Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc.(pty:cc) (mme). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) NOTICE AND ORDER for Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference/Case Management Conference.Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/28/20.(jmo) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Stewart, Paul) (mme). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Leland J. Hebert by Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc..(Stewart, Paul)Attorney Paul A. Stewart added to party Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc.(pty:dft) (mme). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *8,850,931* cc:USPTO (smd)(sjt). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14170524.), filed by Leland J. Hebert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1350-WQH-MDD. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Atkins, Todd)(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Nataupsky on behalf of Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc. (Nataupsky, Steven)Attorney Steven J Nataupsky added to party Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven J Nataupsky added to party Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc.(pty:cc) (mme). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet, re #7 . Teleconference set for 10/21/20 at 9:30 AM. (jmo) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE AND ORDER for Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference/Case Management Conference.Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/28/20.(jmo) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Stewart, Paul) (mme). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Leland J. Hebert by Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc..(Stewart, Paul)Attorney Paul A. Stewart added to party Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc.(pty:dft) (mme). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER. Judge William Q. Hayes has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1350 DMS (MDD).(no document attached) (jcj) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *8,850,931* cc:USPTO (smd)(sjt). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Allied Rubber & Gasket Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14170524.), filed by Leland J. Hebert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1350-WQH-MDD. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Atkins, Todd)(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allied Rubber & Gasket Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul A Stewart

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven J. Nataupsky