This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2020 at 11:11:52 (UTC).

Heathscott et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Heathscott filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01049

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dorothy Ann Heathscott

Roger Dale Heathscott

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Kuntz

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Sean T. Keith

Attorney at Keith Law Group

5050 West Northgate Road, Suite 108

Rogers, AR 72758

Defendant Attorneys

Eric M. Anielak

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Jon A. Strongman

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Michael Bonasso

Attorney at Flaherty, Sensabaugh & Bonasso, P.L.L.C.

Post Office Box 3843

Charleston, WV 25338-3843

James H. Keale

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale

Three Gateway Center, Suite 1301, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Michael A. Tanenbaum

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale

Three Gateway Center, Suite 1301, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Theodore E. O'Reilly

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lyn Peeples Pruitt

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard, P.L.L.C.

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

Tarifa Belle Laddon

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#62

#61

#60

#59

#57

#56

#55

#54

#53

#7

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

178 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) NOTICE of Withdrawal by Michael Bonasso by Boston Scientific Corporation (jap) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore E. O'Reilly on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (O'Reilly, Theodore) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Appearance by Tarifa Belle Laddon on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Laddon, Tarifa) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER granting #56 and #57 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant. Tarifa B. Laddon and Theodore E. O'Reilly are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/9/2020. (ljb) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #55 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys James H. Keale; Jon Strongman; Michael A. Tanenbaum; Eric M. Anielak and Michael Bonasso are terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/8/2020. (amr) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by THEODORE E. OREILLY. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3797149. Filed by Boston Scientific Corporation (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by TARIFA B. LADDON. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3797143. Filed by Boston Scientific Corporation (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MOTION to Substitute Attorney MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOLLOWING REMAND by Boston Scientific Corporation (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Case electronically transferred in from U.S. District Court, District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-08667. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Boston Scientific Corporation have reached a settlement. The court ORDERS as follows: All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to place this case on the pending inactive docket. Plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties show good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 6345 in MDL Case No. 2326 Boston. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/20/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/27/2020.] (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/27/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Dorothy Ann Heathscott, Roger Dale Heathscott. (Keith, Sean) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/27/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/27/2020.] (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Dorothy Ann Heathscott, Roger Dale Heathscott. (Keith, Sean) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/27/2020.] (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman/Partner on 06/11/2013. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 5/23/2013, answer due 7/22/2013. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/27/2020.] (Entered: 06/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/27/2020.] (Entered: 06/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/27/2020.] (Entered: 05/02/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 44 (SHOW CAUSE ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF COLOPLAST A/S, COLOPLAST MANUFACTURING US, LLC AND PORGES S.A.) entered on 04/19/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (jap) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2367515. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cwm) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theodore E O'Reilly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tarifa Belle Laddon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lyn Peeples Pruitt