Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 09:03:16 (UTC).

HEATH v. SHAPIRO et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 HEATH filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against SHAPIRO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen P. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00435

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maureen P. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTHONY HEATH

Waynesburg, PA 15370-8082

Defendants

GREGORY MATTHEWS

ERIK OLSEN

SIMQUITA R. BRIDGES

ROBERT A. DRAWBAUGH

MICHELLE HENRY

JOSH SHAPIRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Scott A. Bradley

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Envelope

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) Correspondence from Plaintiff re 11 Order for Consent/DJO form filed by ANTHONY HEATH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope) (mao) Modified text on 7/2/2019. (tjw) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREGORY MATTHEWS, ERIK OLSEN, MICHELLE HENRY, SIMQUITA R. BRIDGES, JOSH SHAPIRO, ROBERT A. DRAWBAUGH. GREGORY MATTHEWS waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; ERIK OLSEN waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; MICHELLE HENRY waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; SIMQUITA R. BRIDGES waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; JOSH SHAPIRO waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; ROBERT A. DRAWBAUGH waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Bradley, Scott) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Bradley on behalf of SIMQUITA R. BRIDGES, ROBERT A. DRAWBAUGH, MICHELLE HENRY, GREGORY MATTHEWS, ERIK OLSEN, JOSH SHAPIRO. (Bradley, Scott) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE and Waiver, Order, Complaint mailed to all defendants on 5/24/2019 by ANTHONY HEATH (ept) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER that the Marshal is directed to mail by certified mail - return receipt requested, a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit, request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this order to defendant as directed by plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 05/21/2019. A copy of this Order shall be mailed to the Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by ANTHONY HEATH. (ept) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against SIMQUITA R. BRIDGES, ROBERT A. DRAWBAUGH, MICHELLE HENRY, GREGORY MATTHEWS, ERIK OLSEN, JOSH SHAPIRO, filed by ANTHONY HEATH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ept) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

1 #5

Envelope

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Prisoner Account Statement

1 #2

Authorization by Prisoner

1 #1

Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY HEATH. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Authorization by Prisoner, #3 Prisoner Account Statement, #4 Exhibit, #5 Envelope) (ept) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Correspondence from Plaintiff re 11 Order for Consent/DJO form filed by ANTHONY HEATH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope) (mao) Modified text on 7/2/2019. (tjw) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • (#11) TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 07/10/2019, the Plaintiff shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 7/10/2019; Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 06/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. A copy of this Order and a copy of the Consent Form have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record this date. (tjw) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by SIMQUITA R. BRIDGES, ROBERT A. DRAWBAUGH, MICHELLE HENRY, GREGORY MATTHEWS, ERIK OLSEN, JOSH SHAPIRO. (Bradley, Scott) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREGORY MATTHEWS, ERIK OLSEN, MICHELLE HENRY, SIMQUITA R. BRIDGES, JOSH SHAPIRO, ROBERT A. DRAWBAUGH. GREGORY MATTHEWS waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; ERIK OLSEN waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; MICHELLE HENRY waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; SIMQUITA R. BRIDGES waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; JOSH SHAPIRO waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; ROBERT A. DRAWBAUGH waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Bradley, Scott) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Bradley on behalf of SIMQUITA R. BRIDGES, ROBERT A. DRAWBAUGH, MICHELLE HENRY, GREGORY MATTHEWS, ERIK OLSEN, JOSH SHAPIRO. (Bradley, Scott) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE and Waiver, Order, Complaint mailed to all defendants on 5/24/2019 by ANTHONY HEATH (ept) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Remark: Service Copies forwarded to US Marshal's Office this date. (tjw) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that the Marshal is directed to mail by certified mail - return receipt requested, a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit, request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this order to defendant as directed by plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 05/21/2019. A copy of this Order shall be mailed to the Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by ANTHONY HEATH. (ept) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by ANTHONY HEATH. (ept) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against SIMQUITA R. BRIDGES, ROBERT A. DRAWBAUGH, MICHELLE HENRY, GREGORY MATTHEWS, ERIK OLSEN, JOSH SHAPIRO, filed by ANTHONY HEATH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ept) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file the Complaint. The Inmate Accounting Officer is directed to deduct the filing fee from Plaintiff's trust fund account in accordance with the accompanying order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 5/14/2019. A copy of the Order together with this Notice of Electronic Filing are being sent via first class mail both to Plaintiff at his address of record and to the Inmate Accounting Officer at SCI Greene. (tmr) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY HEATH. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Authorization by Prisoner, #3 Prisoner Account Statement, #4 Exhibit, #5 Envelope) (ept) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A. Bradley Esq.