This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:51:52 (UTC).

HEATH v. PERRY et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 HEATH filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against PERRY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN HYLES and TILMAN E SELF, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00188

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

STEPHEN HYLES

Presiding Judge

TILMAN E SELF, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENDRICK D HEATH

Oglethorpe, GA 31068

Defendants

DEPUTY WARDEN TIMOTHY SALES

WARDEN CLINTON PERRY

 

Court Documents

4 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kendrick D. Heath. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02137. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#6

(#6) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to Kendrick D. Heath (esl) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER transferring this action to the Macon Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 5/17/2019. (sap) [Transferred from gand on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #2

Letter

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court on 5/17/2019. (esl) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to Kendrick D. Heath (esl) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court on 5/17/2019. (esl) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02137. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Case electronically transferred to the Middle District of Georgia, Macon Division. (sap) [Transferred from gand on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER transferring this action to the Macon Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 5/17/2019. (sap) [Transferred from gand on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (bnw) [Transferred from gand on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis/Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Kendrick D. Heath. (bnw) [Transferred from gand on 5/17/2019.] Modified on 5/17/2019 to correct event. (ggs). (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kendrick D. Heath. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.