This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/05/2020 at 11:23:55 (UTC).

HEATH et al v. RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS INC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 HEATH filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00125

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jacqueline Henderson

Walona Heath

Ursula Mays

Defendants

Resource Management Systems, Inc.

RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERT MARION SCOTT

209 E Brevard Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

JOHN CLINT WALLACE

209 E Brevard Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorneys

LOUIS E HATCHER

Po Box 2008

Albany, GA 31702-2008

ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD

Po Box 2008

Albany, GA 31702

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Required Form

#7

(#7) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/21/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS INC (SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS INC with Jury Demand.(SHEPPARD, ALFREDA)Attorney ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD added to party RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS INC(pty:dft) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by WALONA HEATH, JACQUELINE HENDERSON, URSULA MAYS (SCOTT, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS INC. (mdm) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to WALONA HEATH, JACQUELINE HENDERSON, URSULA MAYS (mdm) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit Collective Action Opt-In for Plaintiffs

1 #3

Exhibit Plaintiff Representative

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3506290, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff Representative, #4 Exhibit Collective Action Opt-In for Plaintiffs)(SCOTT, ROBERT) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/21/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS INC (SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS INC with Jury Demand.(SHEPPARD, ALFREDA)Attorney ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD added to party RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS INC(pty:dft) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by WALONA HEATH, JACQUELINE HENDERSON, URSULA MAYS (SCOTT, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS INC. (mdm) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to WALONA HEATH, JACQUELINE HENDERSON, URSULA MAYS (mdm) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by JACQUELINE HENDERSON, WALONA HEATH, URSULA MAYS ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(mdm) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3506290, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff Representative, #4 Exhibit Collective Action Opt-In for Plaintiffs)(SCOTT, ROBERT) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOUIS E HATCHER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD