This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 09:19:38 (UTC).

Hearn v. Kroger Texas LP

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Hearn filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kroger Texas LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01648

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beau Hearn

Defendant

Kroger Texas LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Austin Forrest Hartley

Attorney at Hartley Law Firm

2840 E Trinity Mills Rd, Suite 100

Carrollton, TX 75006

Tom A Carse

Attorney at Carse Law Firm

6220 Campbell Road, Suite 401

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant Attorneys

B Kyle Briscoe

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

Seth Ryan Lightfoot

Attorney at PeavlerBriscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

Michael W Stumbaugh, II

Attorney at PeavlerBriscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) TRIAL SETTING ORDER: Trial set for 11/7/2022 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/10/2021) (jmg) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael W Stumbaugh, II on behalf of Kroger Texas LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Stumbaugh, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is ORDERED that attorney Seth R. Lightfoot of the firm of PEAVLER|BRISCOE is hereby withdrawn. Defendant will continue to be represented by its lead counsel of record, B. Kyle Briscoe of PEAVLER|BRISCOE. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/26/2021) (ykp) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Counsel filed by Kroger Texas LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lightfoot, Seth) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beau Hearn. (Hartley, Austin) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/3/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 1/3/2022. Discovery due by 4/29/2022. Status Report due by 4/29/2022. Motions due by 5/6/2022. The court will set the case for trial by separate order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2021) (ygl) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER: No later than 14 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 81.2, or must adopt another party's previously-filed certificate, so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2021) (ygl) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#5

(#5) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Kroger Texas LP. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#4

(#4) Order: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/23/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/26/2021) (ygl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Additional Page(s)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Kroger Texas LP. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12055537) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) Modified text on 7/20/2021 (mla). (Entered: 07/16/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TRIAL SETTING ORDER: Trial set for 11/7/2022 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/10/2021) (jmg) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael W Stumbaugh, II on behalf of Kroger Texas LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Stumbaugh, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is ORDERED that attorney Seth R. Lightfoot of the firm of PEAVLER|BRISCOE is hereby withdrawn. Defendant will continue to be represented by its lead counsel of record, B. Kyle Briscoe of PEAVLER|BRISCOE. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/26/2021) (ykp) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Counsel filed by Kroger Texas LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lightfoot, Seth) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beau Hearn. (Hartley, Austin) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/3/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 1/3/2022. Discovery due by 4/29/2022. Status Report due by 4/29/2022. Motions due by 5/6/2022. The court will set the case for trial by separate order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2021) (ygl) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: No later than 14 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 81.2, or must adopt another party's previously-filed certificate, so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2021) (ygl) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Kroger Texas LP. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/23/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/26/2021) (ygl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Kroger Texas LP. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12055537) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) Modified text on 7/20/2021 (mla). (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth Ryan Lightfoot

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael W Stumbaugh, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer B Kyle Briscoe