This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/01/2022 at 06:18:31 (UTC).

Hearden et al v. Windsor Redding Care Center LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 Hearden filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Windsor Redding Care Center LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dennis M. Cota and Morrison C. England, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00994

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dennis M. Cota

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nancy Hearden

Johanna Trenerry

Irene Kelley

Sally Kelley

Matthew Trenerry

Beverly Fuller

Anthony Trennery

Sharon McMaines

Janis Bodine

Dennis McMaines

Darlyn Dulaney

Karlene Wallace

Jeremiah Boeninger

Sandra Bryant

Tamara Dukes

Robert Rather

Larry Riggs

Robert Riggs

Sally Sorenson

Terrie Callaway

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Frankel, PHV

Russell Reiner

Stuart C. Talley

Wendy Carol York

Other Attorneys

Jeremy A. Lawrence

Joseph Lee

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY in Support of Plaintiffs' #15 Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Talley, Stuart) Modified on 11/22/2022 (Licea Chavez, V). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Wendy Carol York on behalf of Nancy Hearden. Attorney York, Wendy Carol added. (York, Wendy) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of CHANGE of FIRM NAME and Email Address of Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Talley, Stuart) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#24

(#24) OBJECTION by Brius Management Co., Brius, LLC, Shlomo Rechnitz to #23 Reply. (Lawrence, Jeremy) Modified on 8/3/2022 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#23

(#23) REPLY by Charles Balding, et al., in support of #15 Motion to Remand. (Reiner, Russell) Modified on 8/1/2022 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 08/01/2022)

22 #21

Exhibit 21

22 #15

Exhibit 15

15 #1

Declaration of Richard Frankel

15 #15

Main Document

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Main Document

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY in Support of Plaintiffs' #15 Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Talley, Stuart) Modified on 11/22/2022 (Licea Chavez, V). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Wendy Carol York on behalf of Nancy Hearden. Attorney York, Wendy Carol added. (York, Wendy) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of CHANGE of FIRM NAME and Email Address of Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Talley, Stuart) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) OBJECTION by Brius Management Co., Brius, LLC, Shlomo Rechnitz to #23 Reply. (Lawrence, Jeremy) Modified on 8/3/2022 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY by Charles Balding, et al., in support of #15 Motion to Remand. (Reiner, Russell) Modified on 8/1/2022 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Brius Management Co., Brius, LLC, Shlomo Rechnitz in re #20 Opposition to Motion, #21 Request for Judicial Notice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40)(Lawrence, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Brius Management Co., Brius, LLC, Shlomo Rechnitz in re #20 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-20, #3 Exhibit 21-30, #4 Exhibit 31-40)(Lawrence, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) OPPOSITION by Brius Management Co., Brius, LLC, Shlomo Rechnitz to #15 Motion to Remand. Attorney Lawrence, Jeremy A. added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremy A. Lawrence Lawrence, Jeremy) Modified on 7/29/2022 (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 07/14/22 GRANTING Plaintiffs' pending motion to remand are hereby each extended one week to 07/21/22 to file Opposition and 08/01/22 to file Reply. The hearing date on the motion to remand remains vacated.(Licea Chavez, V) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Brius Management Co., Brius, LLC, Shlomo Rechnitz re #17 Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Lee, Joseph) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Staying Defendants' Deadline to Respond to First Amended Complaint pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' forthcoming Motion to Remand by Brius Management Co., Brius, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lawrence, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Shlomo Rechnitz served on 6/16/2022 (Talley, Stuart) Modified on 6/17/2022 (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Lee Samson served on 6/11/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Talley, Stuart) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION re Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Brius Management Co., Brius, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lawrence, Jeremy) Modified on 6/14/2022 (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Brius Management Co., Brius, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent in Civil Cases, #3 Notice of Availability, Voluntary Dispute Resolution, #4 Appearance of Counsel)(Lee, Joseph) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Joseph Lee on behalf of Brius Management Co., Brius, LLC. Attorney Lee, Joseph added. (Lee, Joseph) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Brius Management Co., Brius, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(Lawrence, Jeremy) Modified on 6/9/2022 (Coll, A). (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Brius Management Co., Brius, LLC. (Lawrence, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Shasta County Superior Court, case number 198083 by All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10267435) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lawrence, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less