This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:19:13 (UTC).

Heard v. Georgia's Own Credit Union

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Heard filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Georgia's Own Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Justin S. Anand and Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05486

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen Heard

Defendant

Georgia's Own Credit Union

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Crumby

3620 Piedmont Rd Ne, Ste B #4056, Georgia

Atlanta, GA 30305

Donald W. Benson

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.-ATL

Suite 2900, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

Defendant Attorney

Dion Y. Kohler, .

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, P.C. -Atl

Suite 1200, 171 17Th Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/30/2020. (dmb) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Karen Heard (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9152633). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Karen Heard (Benson, Donald) Modified on 12/10/2019 to correct docket text (adg). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Georgia's Own Credit Union. Discovery ends on 6/26/2020.(Kohler, Dion) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/30/2020. (dmb) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Georgia's Own Credit Union. Discovery ends on 6/26/2020.(Kohler, Dion) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Karen Heard (Benson, Donald) Modified on 12/10/2019 to correct docket text (adg). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Karen Heard (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9152633). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.