This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2021 at 10:31:43 (UTC).

Healy v. Honorlock Incorporated

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Healy filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Honorlock Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81912

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicholas Healy

Defendant

Honorlock Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis I. Mussman

Attorney at Ku & Mussman P.A.

18501 Pines Blvd., Suite 209-A

Pembroke Pines, FL 33029

David F. Slade

Attorney at Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC

519 W. 7Th Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Randall K. Pulliam

Attorney at Carney, Bates & Pulliam, PLLC

519 W. 7Th Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Samuel R. Jackson

Attorney at Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC

519 W. 7Th Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant Attorneys

Beth-Ann Ellenberg Krimsky

Attorney at Greenspoon Marder LLP

200 East Broward Boulevard, Suite 1800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Jamey Robert Campellone

Attorney at Greenspoon Marder LLP

200 East Broward Boulevard, Suite 1800

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Anna Mouw Thompson

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Ariel B. Glickman

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 Thirteenth Street Nw Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

Nicola C. Menaldo

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Nicholas Healy (Mussman, Louis) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

32 #1

Text of Proposed Order

32 #32

Main Document

30 #30

Main Document

#27

(#27) Defendant's MOTION to Stay Discovery by Honorlock Incorporated. Responses due by 12/3/2021 (Krimsky, Beth-Ann) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

24 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

24 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

24 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

24 #24

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Honorlock Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Notice of Filing Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal (Krimsky, Beth-Ann) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/29/2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Randall K. Pulliam, David Slade, Samuel R. Jackson, Nicola C. Menaldo, Anna Mouw Thompson, Ariel B. Glickman, mailing date October 15, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Nicholas Healy (Mussman, Louis) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Nicholas Healy (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mussman, Louis) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #24 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss , #27 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Discovery. Replies due by 1/14/2022 per DE 31 Order. (mc) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #30 Joint Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff shall file his responses to Defendant's Motion to Compel and Motion to Stay Discovery by December 17, 2021 and Defendant shall file its replies by January 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/24/2021. (cbn) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Briefing Schedule by Nicholas Healy. Responses due by 12/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mussman, Louis) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nicholas Healy (Mussman, Louis) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 by Honorlock Incorporated (Campellone, Jamey) (Entered: 11/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Defendant's MOTION to Stay Discovery by Honorlock Incorporated. Responses due by 12/3/2021 (Krimsky, Beth-Ann) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) AFFIDAVIT signed by: Anna Mouw Thompson re #24 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss by Honorlock Incorporated (Krimsky, Beth-Ann) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) AFFIDAVIT of Brandon Smith by Honorlock Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Krimsky, Beth-Ann) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ariel Glickman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15103706 by Honorlock Incorporated. Responses due by 11/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Ariel Glickman, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Krimsky, Beth-Ann) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicola Menaldo. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15103677 by Honorlock Incorporated. Responses due by 11/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Nicola Menaldo, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Krimsky, Beth-Ann) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anna Mouw Thompson. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15103634 by Honorlock Incorporated. Responses due by 11/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Anna Thompson, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Krimsky, Beth-Ann) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file its response by November 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/18/2021. (cbn) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Honorlock Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Campellone, Jamey) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Honorlock Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Notice of Filing Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal (Krimsky, Beth-Ann) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/29/2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Randall K. Pulliam, David Slade, Samuel R. Jackson, Nicola C. Menaldo, Anna Mouw Thompson, Ariel B. Glickman, mailing date October 15, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Nicholas Healy v. Honorlock Incorporated) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15093365, filed by Honorlock Incorporated. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krimsky, Beth-Ann) (ebz). (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anna M. Thompson, PHV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicola C Menaldo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamey R. Campellone

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ariel Brynne Glickman