This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 08:10:54 (UTC).

Healy v. Dukes

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Healy filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Dukes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Theodore D. Chuang. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01943

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theodore D. Chuang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole Healy

Beltsville, MD 20705

Defendant

Charles Aubrey Weathers Dukes

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER DISMISSING CASE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; the Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/25/2019. (c/m 7/25/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/18/2019. (c/m 7/18/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Charles Aubrey Weathers Dukes, filed by Nicole Healy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER DISMISSING CASE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; the Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/25/2019. (c/m 7/25/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/18/2019. (c/m 7/18/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicole Healy.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Charles Aubrey Weathers Dukes, filed by Nicole Healy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less