This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 13:12:08 (UTC).

Healthplan Services, Inc. v. California Physicians' Service, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Healthplan Services, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against California Physicians' Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony E. Porcelli and Mary S. Scriven. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-MC-00050

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Healthplan Services, Inc.

Defendants

E-Integrate

Rakesh Dixit

Media Shark Productions, Inc.

California Physicians' Service, Inc.

Feron Kutsomarkos

California Physicians' Service, Inc. a California nonprofit mutual benefit corporation doing business as Blue Shield of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Klein Ayers

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, 24Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Andrew W. Lennox

Attorney at Lennox Law, PA

5100 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 120

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit G

#2

2 #1

Exhibit Subpoenas

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-80129, filed on 05/14/2019. (AG) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • (#5) TRANSFER to the District of Northern District of California - San Francisco Division. (AG) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 the Parties' Stipulation and Motion to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division. This case shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division, for consolidation with California Physicians' Service, Inc., d/b/a Blue Shield of California v. HealthPlan Services, Inc., Case No. 3:18-cv-03730-JD, before the Honorable James Donato, subject to his Honor's consent. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/7/2019. (DKC) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of service by Healthplan Services, Inc. (Amended Certificate of Service). (Lennox, Andrew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Joint MOTION to transfer case (Stipulation and Motion to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division) by Healthplan Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoenas)(Lennox, Andrew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to quash or modify Subpoenas, MOTION for protective order by Healthplan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(KMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTHPLAN SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS' SERVICE DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Klein Ayers