This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2021 at 22:57:12 (UTC).

Healthier Choices Management Corp. v. Philip Morris USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Healthier Choices Management Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Philip Morris USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04816

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Healthier Choices Management Corp.

Defendants

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Philip Morris Products S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alycen A. Moss

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor-GA

1230 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 400

Atlanta, GA 30309

Lynnette D. Espy-Williams

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

Suite 400, 1230 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Eric Lawrence Levi

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor-DC

Suite 300, 1200 19Th St., N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Barry P. Golob

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1200 19Th Street, Nw, Ste 3Rd Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Aaron S. Lukas

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor-DC

Suite 300, 1200 19Th St., N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Brian E. Ferguson

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges-DC

2001 M Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Stephen P. Bosco

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges-DC

2001 M Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Elizabeth S. Weiswasser

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Charles Adam Pannell, III

Attorney at AddyHart, P.C.

Suite 130, 10 Glenlake Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30328

 

Court Documents

#32

31 #4

Exhibit Ex. 3 - Appl. No. 13_987,851 (11.18.2016 Amendment&Argument)

31 #3

Exhibit Ex. 2 - Appl. No. 15_923,848 (Notice of Allowance)

31 #2

Exhibit Ex. 1 - FDA Scientific Review

31 #1

Brief

#31

#30

#29

#28

RESTRICTED

1 #12

Exhibit -L -(IQOS User Guide)

1 #11

Exhibit -K -(IQOS Quick Start Guide)

1 #10

Exhibit -J -(MRTPA section 2.7 Executive Summary)

1 #9

Exhibit -I -(June 2020 Store Opening Status)

1 #8

Exhibit -H -(Mall of Georgia Map)

1 #7

Exhibit -G -(Store Locator -Defendants' Locations in Atlanta Region)

1 #6

Exhibit -F -(Lenox Square Map)

1 #2

Exhibit -B -(FDA News Release)

#1

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philip Morris USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Philip Morris Products S.A., Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - FDA Scientific Review, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Appl. No. 15_923,848 (Notice of Allowance), #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Appl. No. 13_987,851 (11.18.2016 Amendment&Argument))(Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philip Morris Products S.A. identifying Corporate Parent Philip Morris International, Inc. for Philip Morris Products S.A.. (Fellows, Henry) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Coleman Gretchen on behalf of Philip Morris Products S.A. (Gretchen, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) APPLICATION for Admission of Maximilian A. Grant Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10758952).by Philip Morris Products S.A.. (Fellows, Henry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) APPLICATION for Admission of Richard G. Frenkel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10758930).by Philip Morris Products S.A.. (Fellows, Henry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry D. Fellows, Jr on behalf of Philip Morris Products S.A. (Fellows, Henry) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #24 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen P. Bosco Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10645427). Attorney Stephen P. Bosco added appearing on behalf of Philip Morris USA, Inc. (cdg) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen P. Bosco Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10645427).by Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Electronic Summons Issued as to Philip Morris Products S.A.. (dmb) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by Healthier Choices Management Corp.. Philip Morris USA, Inc. served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Moss, Alycen) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Healthier Choices Management Corp. for Philip Morris Products S.A. (Moss, Alycen) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Philip Morris USA, Inc. (rsh) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Healthier Choices Management Corp. for Philip Morris USA, Inc. (Moss, Alycen) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED AO 120 . (Moss, Alycen) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Healthier Choices Management Corp.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10426189) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - (Patent No. US10561170), #2 Exhibit -B -(FDA News Release), #3 Exhibit -C -(FDA Marketing Order), #4 Exhibit -D -(Store Locator -Defendants' Locations in Atlanta Region), #5 Exhibit -E -(Store Locator of Lenox Square), #6 Exhibit -F -(Lenox Square Map), #7 Exhibit -G -(Store Locator -Defendants' Locations in Atlanta Region), #8 Exhibit -H -(Mall of Georgia Map), #9 Exhibit -I -(June 2020 Store Opening Status), #10 Exhibit -J -(MRTPA section 2.7 Executive Summary), #11 Exhibit -K -(IQOS Quick Start Guide), #12 Exhibit -L -(IQOS User Guide), #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Philip Morris Products S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Philip Morris USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Adam Pannell, III