This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2020 at 19:34:22 (UTC).

Healthcare Ventures of Ohio, LLC et al v. HVO Operations Windup et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Healthcare Ventures of Ohio, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against HVO Operations Windup. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Preston Deavers, Sarah D. Morrison, Algenon L. Marbley and Chelsey M. Vascura. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04991

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

Chelsey M. Vascura

Presiding Judges

Sarah D. Morrison

Algenon L. Marbley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paul M Dauerman

Healthcare Ventures of Ohio, LLC

NH Management Corporation

Health Prime One, Inc.

Defendants

HG Property Services Corp.

John Does 1 through 5

Ralph Hazelbaker

HVO Operations Windup LLC

Greggory St. Clair

First Ohio Investors I, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ali I. Haque

Attorney at Bricker & Eckler, LLP

100 S. Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Quintin Franc Lindsmith

Attorney at Bricker & Eckler LLP

100 South Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth E. Cary

Attorney at Bailey Cavalieri LLC

10 W. Broad Street, Suite 2100

Columbus, OH 43215

Christopher B Burch

Attorney at Bailey Cavalieri LLC

10 West Broad Street, Suite 2100, Suite 2100

Columbus, OH 43215

Patrick M Quinn

Attorney at Brunner Quinn

35 North Fourth Street, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215

Gary Steven Batke

Attorney at Bailey Cavalieri LLC

10 W Broad Street, 21St Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Rick Louis Brunner

Attorney at Brunner Quinn

35 North Fourth Street, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215-4801

Andrew J Gerling

Attorney at Doucet Gerling Co., L.P.A.

655 Metro Place South, Suite 600

Dublin, OH 43017

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

#6

5 #2

Exhibit Praecipe to Clerk

5 #1

Exhibit Notice of Filing Defendants' Joint Notice of Removal

#5

#2

1 #3

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A: Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Other Remedies

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand to Court of Common Plea for Franklin County, Ohio. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/13/2020. (cw) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TERMINATING #14 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 11/2/2020 02:00 PM via Teleconference. The conference will be rescheduled, if applicable, following the resolution of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (agm) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 11/2/2020 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #2 Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Burch, Christopher) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTATION ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. John Does 1 through 5 answer due 10/26/2020; First Ohio Investors I, LLC answer due 10/26/2020; HG Property Services Corp. answer due 10/26/2020; HVO Operations Windup LLC answer due 10/26/2020; Ralph Hazelbaker answer due 10/26/2020; Greggory St. Clair answer due 10/26/2020. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/13/2020. (agm) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/26/2020. by Defendants John Does 1 through 5, First Ohio Investors I, LLC, HG Property Services Corp., HVO Operations Windup LLC, Ralph Hazelbaker, Greggory St. Clair. (Burch, Christopher) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiffs Paul M Dauerman, Health Prime One, Inc., Healthcare Ventures of Ohio, LLC, NH Management Corporation. (Haque, Ali) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant First Ohio Investors I, LLC. (Burch, Christopher) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Setting Hearing pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(b)(3): Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2020 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley in his virtual courtroom; dial in by phone; United States: +1 (646) 749-3112; Access Code: 347-407-869. Defendant's Response to Motion #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court is due 10/2/2020; Plaintiff's Reply is due 10/6/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/1/2020. (cw) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Paul M Dauerman, Health Prime One, Inc., Healthcare Ventures of Ohio, LLC, NH Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Haque, Ali) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:20-cv-4901 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison and Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/24/2020. (kk2) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Defendants First Ohio Investors I, LLC, HG Property Services Corp., HVO Operations Windup LLC, Ralph Hazelbaker, Greggory St. Clair re #1 Notice of Removal, of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Defendants' Joint Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Praecipe to Clerk) (Burch, Christopher) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed in Franklin County Common Pleas Court by Plaintiffs Paul M Dauerman, Health Prime One Inc., Healthcare Ventures of Ohio LLC, and NH Management Corporation. Responses due by 10/14/2020. (kk2) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed in Franklin County Common Pleas Court by Health Prime One Inc., NH Management Corporation, Paul M Dauerman, and Healthcare Ventures of Ohio LLC against John Does 1 through 5, First Ohio Investors I LLC, HG Property Services Corp., HVO Operations Windup LLC, Ralph Hazelbaker, and Greggory St. Clair (kk2) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20-CV-006215 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7670306), filed by HG Property Services Corp., First Ohio Investors I, LLC, Greggory St. Clair, Ralph E Hazelbaker, HVO Operations Windup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Other Remedies, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Burch, Christopher) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NH Management Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick M Quinn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew J Gerling