This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2021 at 09:20:01 (UTC).

Healthcare Venture Partners, LLC v. Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 Healthcare Venture Partners, LLC filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas R. Cole. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas R. Cole

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Healthcare Venture Partners, LLC d/b/a the Ridge

25 Whitney Drive, Ste 122

Milford, OH 45150

Healthcare Venture Partners, LLC doing business as The Ridge

Defendants

Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield

Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Maine

Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company operating in Illinois as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and in Texas as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas

Community Insurance Company d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield c/o CT Corporation System

Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association

Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois

Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas

Community Insurance Company doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield

Health Care Service Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zachary Gottesman

Attorney at Gottesman & Associates

404 East 12Th Street, First Floor

Cincinnati, OH 45243

Defendant Attorneys

Kent Allen Britt

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease - 1

301 E 4Th St., Suite 3500, Great American Tower

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Wesley Abrams

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP

301 E. Fourth Street, Suite 3500

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Jeffrey Francis Peck

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP - 1

2800 Cincinnati Commerce Center, 600 Vine Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202-2409

 

Court Documents

#16

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

4 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Other

#3

#2

1 #6

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - 2019 Amendments

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - 2019 Statement of Benefits

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Motion for Temporary Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Remand. Pursuant to #16 Notice, Plaintiff has indicated its consent to the motion. All other dates, deadlines and matters in this case are stayed until 4/30/21. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/8/21. (sct) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Maine, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Community Insurance Company, Health Care Service Corporation re #14 MOTION to Stay re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees Pending Resolution of Motion to Remand (Britt, Kent) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand. Response due by 3/18/21. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/4/21. (sct) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re Doc. #10 to Respond to Motion to Remand. New date requested 3/18/2021 by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Maine, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Community Insurance Company, Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Britt, Kent) Modified to include link on 3/4/2021 (kl). (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Stay re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees Pending Resolution of Motion to Remand by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Maine, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Community Insurance Company, Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Britt, Kent) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Maine, Anthem Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem Inc. for Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Maine.. (Britt, Kent) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Community Insurance Company, Anthem Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem Inc. for Community Insurance Company.. (Britt, Kent) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendants Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Maine, Community Insurance Company (Abrams, Wesley) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Healthcare Venture Partners, LLC. (Gottesman, Zachary) Modified docket text on 2/12/2021 (kh). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 2/12/2021 (eh). (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Amended Rule 7.2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Peck, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 1/27/2021 (eh). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #4 Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead. Counsel for Plaintiff indicated via email to the Court that the Motion is unopposed. Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association shall answer, move, or otherwise plead on or before 3/5/21. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 1/21/21. (sct) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Peck, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Correction: Please disregard [FORMER DOC. 6]- Document filed without certificate of service. Attorney will refile. (kl) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Peck, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, New date requested 3/5/2021. by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead) (Peck, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #3 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Counsel for Plaintiff indicated via email to the Court that the Motion is unopposed. Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Maine, Community Insurance Company, and Health Care Service Corporation to answer, move, or otherwise plead by 3/5/21. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 1/19/21. (sct) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, originally filed in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2020 CVH 01031) on 1/12/2021 by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Maine, Community Insurance Company d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield c/o CT Corporation System, Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company operating in Illinois as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and in Texas as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas. (kh) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Maine, Community Insurance Company d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield c/o CT Corporation System, Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company operating in Illinois as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and in Texas as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, originally filed in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2020 CVH 01031) on 12/10/2020 by Healthcare Venture Partners, LLC d/b/a the Ridge. (kh) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kh) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clermont County OH Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020 CVH 01031 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7990521), filed by Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Maine, Community Insurance Company d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield c/o CT Corporation System, Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2013 Master Contract, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2019 Statement of Benefits, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2019 Amendments, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Britt, Kent) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois is a litigant

Latest cases where Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield is a litigant

Latest cases where Community Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION ILLINOIS is a litigant