This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 07:12:27 (UTC).

Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Cantor Fitzgerald L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04787

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC

Defendants

Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz

Attorney at Law Offices of Jonathan Stieglitz

11845 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan Marc Herman

Attorney at Jonathan Herman Law Offices

633 West 5Th Street 26Th And 28Th Floors

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT CANTOR FITZGERALD'S UNOPPOSED REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT STATUS CONFERENCE #20 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

22 #1

Schedule Worksheet

22 #22

Main Document

21 #1

Schedule Worksheet

21 #21

Main Document

20 #1

Proposed Order

20 #20

Main Document

#19

(#19) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Pretrial Conference Via Zoom #15 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by August 29, 2022. Please refer to the Court's standing order for details on filing a request to appear by telephone. (smo) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

15 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

1 #5

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT CANTOR FITZGERALD'S UNOPPOSED REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT STATUS CONFERENCE #20 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 days, filed by Defendant Cantor Fitzgerald L.P... (Attachments: #1 Schedule Worksheet)(Herman, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 days, filed by Defendant Cantor Fitzgerald L.P... (Attachments: #1 Schedule Worksheet)(Herman, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REQUEST for Leave of Jonathan M Herman to Appear for Status Conference Telephonically filed by Defendant Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. Request set for hearing on 9/19/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Herman, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Pretrial Conference Via Zoom #15 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by August 29, 2022. Please refer to the Court's standing order for details on filing a request to appear by telephone. (smo) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORRECTED NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents #17 RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Pretrial Conference Via Zoom #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. PDF is a "UNOPPOSED MOTION" to set PTC as a zoom hearing... Filer erroneous set filing for 9/19/22 10:00 AM hearing ( the same date as the actual scheduling conference, not PTC)... clerk has TERMED ONLY this erroneous hearing which does not appear on the document. The "Motion" remains pending the Court's ruling. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need n ot take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Pretrial Conference Via Zoom #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. PDF is a "UNOPPOSED MOTION" to set PTC as a zoom hearing...Filer erroneous set filing for 9/19/22 10:00 AM hearing ( the same date as the PTC)..clerk has TERMED ONLY this erroneous hearing which does not appear on the document. The "Motion" remains pending the Court's ruling. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #12 and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Cantor Fitzgerald L.P..(Herman, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Pretrial Conference Via Zoom filed by Defendant Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. Motion set for hearing on 9/19/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Herman, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC, (Stieglitz, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STIPULATION (ECF No. #8 ) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The stipulation #8 is denied. On the basis that Plaintiff intends to amend its pleading before Defendant files a response thereto, the Court on its own motion extends Defendant's deadline to respond to the original Complaint to August 8, 2022. (lom) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 30 days after Plaintiff files amended complaint filed by Defendant Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herman, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cantor Fitzgerald L.P., identifying Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Herman, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Cantor Fitzgerald L.P., Does1-10. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/7/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, case number 22STLC03831 Receipt No: ACACDC-33625256 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Jonathan Marc Herman added to party Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.(pty:dft))(Herman, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHCARE ALLY MANAGEMENT OF CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan M Herman