This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2019 at 07:10:32 (UTC).

Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean P. Rosenbluth and Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-08051

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC

Defendants

Health Care Service Corporation

Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz

Attorney at Law Offices of Jonathan Stieglitz

11845 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorneys

Amir Shlesinger

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

Sarah Barr Johansen

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

Michelle L Cheng

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss

7 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Di

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case * Defendant Health Care Service Corporation DBA Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Illinois Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint * filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Shlesinger, Amir) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation.(Attorney Sarah Barr Johansen added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Barr Johansen added to party Health Care Service Corporation(pty:dft))(Johansen, Sarah) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation, identifying Health Care Service Corporation; Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois. (Shlesinger, Amir) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation. (Shlesinger, Amir) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

1 #3

Proof of Service

1 #2

Declaration of John Kosky

1 #1

Declaration of Sarah Johansen

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19SMCV00415 Receipt No: 0973-24454082 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Johansen, #2 Declaration of John Kosky, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Amir Shlesinger added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois(pty:dft), Attorney Amir Shlesinger added to party Health Care Service Corporation(pty:dft))(Shlesinger, Amir) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case * Defendant Health Care Service Corporation DBA Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Illinois Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint * filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Shlesinger, Amir) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation.(Attorney Sarah Barr Johansen added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Barr Johansen added to party Health Care Service Corporation(pty:dft))(Johansen, Sarah) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY of First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC, in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/9/2019, attached as Exhibit 1.(jtil) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation, identifying Health Care Service Corporation; Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois. (Shlesinger, Amir) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation. (Shlesinger, Amir) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19SMCV00415 Receipt No: 0973-24454082 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Johansen, #2 Declaration of John Kosky, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Amir Shlesinger added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois(pty:dft), Attorney Amir Shlesinger added to party Health Care Service Corporation(pty:dft))(Shlesinger, Amir) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less